H.B. No. 2100 AN ACT relating to the salary for certain employees of the Department of Public Safety of the State of Texas. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 411, Government Code, is amended by adding Section 411.0162 to read as follows: Sec. 411.0162. SALARIES FOR CERTAIN TROOPERS. (a) Notwithstanding any other provision of law and subject to the availability of money appropriated for that purpose, the department may pay its employees classified as Trooper Trainee, Probationary Trooper, and Trooper I at rates that exceed the maximum rates designated in Salary Schedule C of the position classification schedule prescribed by the General Appropriations Act for the state fiscal biennium ending August 31, 2013, for that position by up to 10 percent. (b) Notwithstanding Subsection (a) or any other provision of law and subject to the availability of money appropriated for that purpose, in the state fiscal year beginning September 1, 2013, the department may pay its employees classified as Trooper Trainee, Probationary Trooper, and Trooper I at rates that exceed the maximum rates designated in Salary Schedule C of the position classification schedule prescribed by the General Appropriations Act for the state fiscal biennium ending August 31, 2013, for that position by up to five percent. This subsection expires September 1, 2014. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2013. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 2100 was passed by the House on May 9, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 136, Nays 6, 2 present, not voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. No. 2100 on May 23, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 2, 2 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 2100 was passed by the Senate, with amendments, on May 21, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: __________________ Date __________________ Governor