Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2124 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 83RD LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            April 10, 2013      TO: Honorable Tryon D. Lewis, Chair, House Committee on Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB2124 by Thompson, Senfronia (Relating to a medical power of attorney.), As Introduced    No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.  The bill would amend the Health and Safety Code to add the option to have a signature on a medical power of attorney form be acknowledged before a notary public. The bill would require the Health and Human Services Commission (HHSC) to adopt the forms necessary to comply with the changes in the law by October 1, 2013. Except for the section that requires HHSC to adopt forms to comply with the bill, which takes effect September 1, 2013, the bill would take effect January 1, 2014. HHSC and the Office of Court Administration anticipate any additional work resulting from the enactment of the bill could be reasonably absorbed within current resources. Local Government Impact No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.    Source Agencies:212 Office of Court Administration, Texas Judicial Council, 529 Health and Human Services Commission   LBB Staff:  UP, CL, ES, VJC    

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 83RD LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
April 10, 2013





  TO: Honorable Tryon D. Lewis, Chair, House Committee on Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB2124 by Thompson, Senfronia (Relating to a medical power of attorney.), As Introduced  

TO: Honorable Tryon D. Lewis, Chair, House Committee on Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB2124 by Thompson, Senfronia (Relating to a medical power of attorney.), As Introduced

 Honorable Tryon D. Lewis, Chair, House Committee on Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence 

 Honorable Tryon D. Lewis, Chair, House Committee on Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence 

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB2124 by Thompson, Senfronia (Relating to a medical power of attorney.), As Introduced

HB2124 by Thompson, Senfronia (Relating to a medical power of attorney.), As Introduced



No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.



The bill would amend the Health and Safety Code to add the option to have a signature on a medical power of attorney form be acknowledged before a notary public. The bill would require the Health and Human Services Commission (HHSC) to adopt the forms necessary to comply with the changes in the law by October 1, 2013. Except for the section that requires HHSC to adopt forms to comply with the bill, which takes effect September 1, 2013, the bill would take effect January 1, 2014. HHSC and the Office of Court Administration anticipate any additional work resulting from the enactment of the bill could be reasonably absorbed within current resources.

Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 212 Office of Court Administration, Texas Judicial Council, 529 Health and Human Services Commission

212 Office of Court Administration, Texas Judicial Council, 529 Health and Human Services Commission

LBB Staff: UP, CL, ES, VJC

 UP, CL, ES, VJC