Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2124 House Committee Report / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 83RD LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            April 18, 2013      TO: Honorable Tryon D. Lewis, Chair, House Committee on Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB2124 by Thompson, Senfronia (Relating to a medical power of attorney.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted    No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.  The bill would amend the Health and Safety Code to add the option to have a signature on a medical power of attorney form be acknowledged before a notary public. The bill would require the Health and Human Services Commission (HHSC) to adopt the forms necessary to comply with the changes in the law by October 1, 2013. The bill would provide that actions under this section may be brought in district or statutory probate courts, as applicable. Except for the sections that change the medical power of attorney forms and establish the validity of the changes, which would become effective January 1, 2014, the bill would take effect September 1, 2013. HHSC and the Office of Court Administration anticipate any additional work resulting from the enactment of the bill could be reasonably absorbed within current resources. Local Government Impact No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.    Source Agencies:212 Office of Court Administration, Texas Judicial Council, 529 Health and Human Services Commission   LBB Staff:  UP, ES, CL, VJC    

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 83RD LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
April 18, 2013





  TO: Honorable Tryon D. Lewis, Chair, House Committee on Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB2124 by Thompson, Senfronia (Relating to a medical power of attorney.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted  

TO: Honorable Tryon D. Lewis, Chair, House Committee on Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB2124 by Thompson, Senfronia (Relating to a medical power of attorney.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted

 Honorable Tryon D. Lewis, Chair, House Committee on Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence 

 Honorable Tryon D. Lewis, Chair, House Committee on Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence 

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB2124 by Thompson, Senfronia (Relating to a medical power of attorney.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted

HB2124 by Thompson, Senfronia (Relating to a medical power of attorney.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted



No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.



The bill would amend the Health and Safety Code to add the option to have a signature on a medical power of attorney form be acknowledged before a notary public. The bill would require the Health and Human Services Commission (HHSC) to adopt the forms necessary to comply with the changes in the law by October 1, 2013. The bill would provide that actions under this section may be brought in district or statutory probate courts, as applicable. Except for the sections that change the medical power of attorney forms and establish the validity of the changes, which would become effective January 1, 2014, the bill would take effect September 1, 2013. HHSC and the Office of Court Administration anticipate any additional work resulting from the enactment of the bill could be reasonably absorbed within current resources.

The bill would amend the Health and Safety Code to add the option to have a signature on a medical power of attorney form be acknowledged before a notary public. The bill would require the Health and Human Services Commission (HHSC) to adopt the forms necessary to comply with the changes in the law by October 1, 2013. The bill would provide that actions under this section may be brought in district or statutory probate courts, as applicable. Except for the sections that change the medical power of attorney forms and establish the validity of the changes, which would become effective January 1, 2014, the bill would take effect September 1, 2013.

HHSC and the Office of Court Administration anticipate any additional work resulting from the enactment of the bill could be reasonably absorbed within current resources.

Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 212 Office of Court Administration, Texas Judicial Council, 529 Health and Human Services Commission

212 Office of Court Administration, Texas Judicial Council, 529 Health and Human Services Commission

LBB Staff: UP, ES, CL, VJC

 UP, ES, CL, VJC