Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB213 Engrossed / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hilderbran, Villalba, Workman, Lozano, H.B. No. 213
 Capriglione, et al.


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the $1 million total revenue exemption for the
 franchise tax.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1(c), Chapter 286 (H.B. 4765), Acts of
 the 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, as amended by Section
 37.01, Chapter 4 (S.B. 1), Acts of the 82nd Legislature, 1st Called
 Session, 2011, is repealed.
 SECTION 2.  Section 2, Chapter 286 (H.B. 4765), Acts of the
 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, as amended by Section
 37.02, Chapter 4 (S.B. 1), Acts of the 82nd Legislature, 1st Called
 Session, 2011, and which amended former Subsection (d), Section
 171.002, Tax Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 3.  Section 3, Chapter 286 (H.B. 4765), Acts of the
 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, as amended by Section
 37.03, Chapter 4 (S.B. 1), Acts of the 82nd Legislature, 1st Called
 Session, 2011, and which amended former Subsection (a), Section
 171.0021, Tax Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 4.  (a) Effective January 1, 2016, Section
 171.002(d), Tax Code, as amended by Section 1(a), Chapter 286 (H.B.
 4765), Acts of the 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (d)  A taxable entity is not required to pay any tax and is
 not considered to owe any tax for a period if:
 (1)  the amount of tax computed for the taxable entity
 is less than $1,000; or
 (2)  the amount of the taxable entity's total revenue
 from its entire business is less than or equal to $5 [$1] million or
 the amount determined under Section 171.006 per 12-month period on
 which margin is based.
 (b)  Effective January 1, 2018, Section 171.002(d), Tax
 Code, as amended by Section 1(a), Chapter 286 (H.B. 4765), Acts of
 the 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, is amended to read as
 follows:
 (d)  A taxable entity is not required to pay any tax and is
 not considered to owe any tax for a period if:
 (1)  the amount of tax computed for the taxable entity
 is less than $1,000; or
 (2)  the amount of the taxable entity's total revenue
 from its entire business is less than or equal to $10 [$1] million
 or the amount determined under Section 171.006 per 12-month period
 on which margin is based.
 (c)  Effective January 1, 2020, Section 171.002(d), Tax
 Code, as amended by Section 1(a), Chapter 286 (H.B. 4765), Acts of
 the 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, is amended to read as
 follows:
 (d)  A taxable entity is not required to pay any tax and is
 not considered to owe any tax for a period if:
 (1)  the amount of tax computed for the taxable entity
 is less than $1,000; or
 (2)  the amount of the taxable entity's total revenue
 from its entire business is less than or equal to $15 [$1] million
 or the amount determined under Section 171.006 per 12-month period
 on which margin is based.
 (d)  Effective January 1, 2022, Section 171.002(d), Tax
 Code, as amended by Section 1(a), Chapter 286 (H.B. 4765), Acts of
 the 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, is amended to read as
 follows:
 (d)  A taxable entity is not required to pay any tax and is
 not considered to owe any tax for a period if:
 (1)  the amount of tax computed for the taxable entity
 is less than $1,000; or
 (2)  the amount of the taxable entity's total revenue
 from its entire business is less than or equal to $20 [$1] million
 or the amount determined under Section 171.006 per 12-month period
 on which margin is based.
 (e)  This section applies only to a report originally due on
 or after January 1, 2016.
 SECTION 5.  Section 171.006(b), Tax Code, is amended to read
 as follows:
 (b)  Beginning in 2010, on January 1 of each even-numbered
 year, the amounts prescribed by Sections 171.002(d)(2)[,
 171.0021,] and 171.1013(c) are increased or decreased by an amount
 equal to the amount prescribed by those sections on December 31 of
 the preceding year multiplied by the percentage increase or
 decrease during the preceding state fiscal biennium in the consumer
 price index and rounded to the nearest $10,000.
 SECTION 6.  Sections 171.0021 and 171.1016(d), Tax Code, are
 repealed.
 SECTION 7.  Except as otherwise provided by this Act, this
 Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of
 all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39,
 Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this Act does not receive the
 vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect
 September 1, 2013.