H.B. No. 2152 AN ACT relating to fees charged to certain recreational vehicle parks. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 13.087, Water Code, is amended by amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (b-1) to read as follows: (b) A municipally owned utility that provides nonsubmetered master metered utility service to a recreational vehicle park shall determine the rates for that service on the same basis the utility uses to determine the rates for other commercial businesses[, including hotels and motels,] that serve transient customers and receive nonsubmetered master metered utility service from the utility. (b-1) A municipally owned utility that provides nonsubmetered master metered utility service to a recreational vehicle park may not charge a recreational vehicle park a fee that the utility does not charge other commercial businesses that serve transient customers and receive nonsubmetered master metered utility service from the utility. SECTION 2. Section 49.351, Water Code, is amended by adding Subsection (m) to read as follows: (m) Notwithstanding any other provision of this section, a district may not charge a fee to a recreational vehicle park, as defined by Section 13.087, on the basis of connections the park provides for the park's transient customers. A fee charged to a recreational vehicle park must be based on the park's nonsubmetered master meter connection. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2013. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 2152 was passed by the House on May 4, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 134, Nays 0, 2 present, not voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to H.B. No. 2152 on May 23, 2013, and requested the appointment of a conference committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No. 2152 on May 26, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 140, Nays 0, 1 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 2152 was passed by the Senate, with amendments, on May 20, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No. 2152 on May 26, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: __________________ Date __________________ Governor