Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2201 House Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    83R21278 CAE-D
 By: Farney H.B. No. 2201
 Substitute the following for H.B. No. 2201:
 By:  Rodriguez of Travis C.S.H.B. No. 2201


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to increasing the courses offered in the career and
 technology education curriculum.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 28, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 28.00222 to read as follows:
 Sec. 28.00222.  INCREASE IN CAREER AND TECHNOLOGY EDUCATION
 COURSES. (a) Not later than September 1, 2014, the State Board of
 Education shall ensure that at least six advanced career and
 technology education courses are approved to satisfy a fourth
 credit in mathematics required for high school graduation.
 (b)  Not later than January 1, 2015, the commissioner shall
 review and report to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the
 speaker of the house of representatives, and the presiding officer
 of each standing committee of the legislature with primary
 responsibility over public primary and secondary education
 regarding the progress of increasing the number of courses approved
 for the career and technology education curriculum. The
 commissioner shall include in the report a detailed description of
 any new courses, including instructional materials and required
 equipment, if any.
 (c)  This section expires September 1, 2015.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.