LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD Austin, Texas FISCAL NOTE, 83RD LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION April 24, 2013 TO: Honorable John Davis, Chair, House Committee on Economic & Small Business Development FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board IN RE:HB2201 by Farney (Relating to increasing the courses offered in the career and technology education curriculum.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated. The bill would require the State Board of Education to have approved at least six advanced career and technical education (CTE) courses to satisfy a fourth credit in mathematics required for high school graduation by September 1, 2014. The Commissioner of Education would be required to review the progress of career and technology course expansion and report on that progress to the governor and legislative leadership by January 1, 2015. The report would be required to include a detailed description of new courses. The bill would take effect September 1, 2013, and the provisions would expire September 1, 2015. The Texas Education Agency (Agency) anticipates that a total of five advanced CTE courses that may be used to satisfy a fourth mathematics credit will be in place by September 1, 2013. The Agency indicates that approval of a sixth course for this purpose can be accomplished within existing resources. For the purpose of this estimate, it is assumed that the availability of a sixth advanced CTE course would not significantly change the number of students generating weighted funding under the Foundation School Program. Local Government Impact School districts and charter schools would be authorized to offer additional advanced CTE courses to satisfy a fourth credit in mathematics required for high school graduation. No significant fiscal implications would be anticipated. Source Agencies:701 Central Education Agency LBB Staff: UP, RB, JSc, JSp LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD Austin, Texas FISCAL NOTE, 83RD LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION April 24, 2013 TO: Honorable John Davis, Chair, House Committee on Economic & Small Business Development FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board IN RE:HB2201 by Farney (Relating to increasing the courses offered in the career and technology education curriculum.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted TO: Honorable John Davis, Chair, House Committee on Economic & Small Business Development FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board IN RE: HB2201 by Farney (Relating to increasing the courses offered in the career and technology education curriculum.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted Honorable John Davis, Chair, House Committee on Economic & Small Business Development Honorable John Davis, Chair, House Committee on Economic & Small Business Development Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board HB2201 by Farney (Relating to increasing the courses offered in the career and technology education curriculum.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted HB2201 by Farney (Relating to increasing the courses offered in the career and technology education curriculum.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated. No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated. The bill would require the State Board of Education to have approved at least six advanced career and technical education (CTE) courses to satisfy a fourth credit in mathematics required for high school graduation by September 1, 2014. The Commissioner of Education would be required to review the progress of career and technology course expansion and report on that progress to the governor and legislative leadership by January 1, 2015. The report would be required to include a detailed description of new courses. The bill would take effect September 1, 2013, and the provisions would expire September 1, 2015. The Texas Education Agency (Agency) anticipates that a total of five advanced CTE courses that may be used to satisfy a fourth mathematics credit will be in place by September 1, 2013. The Agency indicates that approval of a sixth course for this purpose can be accomplished within existing resources. For the purpose of this estimate, it is assumed that the availability of a sixth advanced CTE course would not significantly change the number of students generating weighted funding under the Foundation School Program. The bill would require the State Board of Education to have approved at least six advanced career and technical education (CTE) courses to satisfy a fourth credit in mathematics required for high school graduation by September 1, 2014. The Commissioner of Education would be required to review the progress of career and technology course expansion and report on that progress to the governor and legislative leadership by January 1, 2015. The report would be required to include a detailed description of new courses. The bill would take effect September 1, 2013, and the provisions would expire September 1, 2015. The Texas Education Agency (Agency) anticipates that a total of five advanced CTE courses that may be used to satisfy a fourth mathematics credit will be in place by September 1, 2013. The Agency indicates that approval of a sixth course for this purpose can be accomplished within existing resources. For the purpose of this estimate, it is assumed that the availability of a sixth advanced CTE course would not significantly change the number of students generating weighted funding under the Foundation School Program. Local Government Impact School districts and charter schools would be authorized to offer additional advanced CTE courses to satisfy a fourth credit in mathematics required for high school graduation. No significant fiscal implications would be anticipated. Source Agencies: 701 Central Education Agency 701 Central Education Agency LBB Staff: UP, RB, JSc, JSp UP, RB, JSc, JSp