By: Farney, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Lucio) H.B. No. 2201 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2013; May 10, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Education; May 17, 2013, reported favorably, as amended, by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 17, 2013, sent to printer.) COMMITTEE AMENDMENT NO. 1 By: Lucio Amend H.B. No. 2201 (engrossed version), in SECTION 1 of the bill, adding Section 28.00222(a), Education Code (page 1, lines 11 and 12), by striking "and satisfies statistics". A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to increasing the courses offered in the career and technology education curriculum. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 28, Education Code, is amended by adding Section 28.00222 to read as follows: Sec. 28.00222. INCREASE IN CAREER AND TECHNOLOGY EDUCATION COURSES. (a) Not later than September 1, 2014, the State Board of Education shall ensure that at least six advanced career and technology education courses, including a course in personal financial literacy that is consistent with Section 28.0021 and satisfies statistics, are approved to satisfy a fourth credit in mathematics required for high school graduation. (b) Not later than January 1, 2015, the commissioner shall review and report to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of representatives, and the presiding officer of each standing committee of the legislature with primary responsibility over public primary and secondary education regarding the progress of increasing the number of courses approved for the career and technology education curriculum. The commissioner shall include in the report a detailed description of any new courses, including instructional materials and required equipment, if any. (c) This section expires September 1, 2015. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2013. * * * * *