Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2201 Senate Committee Report / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 83RD LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            May 17, 2013      TO: Honorable Dan Patrick, Chair, Senate Committee on Education      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB2201 by Farney (Relating to increasing the courses offered in the career and technology education curriculum.), Committee Report 2nd House, As Amended    No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.  The bill would require the State Board of Education to have approved at least six advanced career and technical education (CTE) courses to satisfy a fourth credit in mathematics required for high school graduation, including a personal financial literacy course, by September 1, 2014.  The Commissioner of Education would be required to review the progress of career and technology course expansion and report on that progress to the governor and legislative leadership by January 1, 2015.  The report would be required to include a detailed description of new courses. The bill would take effect September 1, 2013, and the provisions would expire September 1, 2015. The Texas Education Agency (TEA) anticipates that a total of five advanced CTE courses that may be used to satisfy a fourth mathematics credit will be in place by September 1, 2013.  The TEA indicates that approval of a sixth course for this purpose can be accomplished within existing resources.  For the purpose of this estimate, it is assumed that the availability of a sixth advanced CTE course would not significantly change the number of students generating weighted funding under the Foundation School Program. Local Government Impact School districts and charter schools would be authorized to offer additional advanced CTE courses to satisfy a fourth credit in mathematics required for high school graduation.  No significant fiscal implications would be anticipated.    Source Agencies:701 Central Education Agency   LBB Staff:  UP, JBi, RB, JSc, JSp    

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 83RD LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
May 17, 2013





  TO: Honorable Dan Patrick, Chair, Senate Committee on Education      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB2201 by Farney (Relating to increasing the courses offered in the career and technology education curriculum.), Committee Report 2nd House, As Amended  

TO: Honorable Dan Patrick, Chair, Senate Committee on Education
FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB2201 by Farney (Relating to increasing the courses offered in the career and technology education curriculum.), Committee Report 2nd House, As Amended

 Honorable Dan Patrick, Chair, Senate Committee on Education 

 Honorable Dan Patrick, Chair, Senate Committee on Education 

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB2201 by Farney (Relating to increasing the courses offered in the career and technology education curriculum.), Committee Report 2nd House, As Amended

HB2201 by Farney (Relating to increasing the courses offered in the career and technology education curriculum.), Committee Report 2nd House, As Amended



No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.



The bill would require the State Board of Education to have approved at least six advanced career and technical education (CTE) courses to satisfy a fourth credit in mathematics required for high school graduation, including a personal financial literacy course, by September 1, 2014.  The Commissioner of Education would be required to review the progress of career and technology course expansion and report on that progress to the governor and legislative leadership by January 1, 2015.  The report would be required to include a detailed description of new courses. The bill would take effect September 1, 2013, and the provisions would expire September 1, 2015. The Texas Education Agency (TEA) anticipates that a total of five advanced CTE courses that may be used to satisfy a fourth mathematics credit will be in place by September 1, 2013.  The TEA indicates that approval of a sixth course for this purpose can be accomplished within existing resources.  For the purpose of this estimate, it is assumed that the availability of a sixth advanced CTE course would not significantly change the number of students generating weighted funding under the Foundation School Program.

The bill would require the State Board of Education to have approved at least six advanced career and technical education (CTE) courses to satisfy a fourth credit in mathematics required for high school graduation, including a personal financial literacy course, by September 1, 2014.  The Commissioner of Education would be required to review the progress of career and technology course expansion and report on that progress to the governor and legislative leadership by January 1, 2015.  The report would be required to include a detailed description of new courses.

The bill would take effect September 1, 2013, and the provisions would expire September 1, 2015.

The Texas Education Agency (TEA) anticipates that a total of five advanced CTE courses that may be used to satisfy a fourth mathematics credit will be in place by September 1, 2013.  The TEA indicates that approval of a sixth course for this purpose can be accomplished within existing resources.  For the purpose of this estimate, it is assumed that the availability of a sixth advanced CTE course would not significantly change the number of students generating weighted funding under the Foundation School Program.

Local Government Impact

School districts and charter schools would be authorized to offer additional advanced CTE courses to satisfy a fourth credit in mathematics required for high school graduation.  No significant fiscal implications would be anticipated.

Source Agencies: 701 Central Education Agency

701 Central Education Agency

LBB Staff: UP, JBi, RB, JSc, JSp

 UP, JBi, RB, JSc, JSp