Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2201 Comm Sub / Bill

                    By: Farney, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Lucio) H.B. No. 2201
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2013;
 May 10, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 17, 2013, reported favorably, as amended, by the
 following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 17, 2013, sent to printer.)


 COMMITTEE AMENDMENT NO. 1 By:  Lucio
 Amend H.B. No. 2201 (engrossed version), in SECTION 1 of the
 bill, adding Section 28.00222(a), Education Code (page 1, lines 11
 and 12), by striking "and satisfies statistics".
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to increasing the courses offered in the career and
 technology education curriculum.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 28, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 28.00222 to read as follows:
 Sec. 28.00222.  INCREASE IN CAREER AND TECHNOLOGY EDUCATION
 COURSES. (a) Not later than September 1, 2014, the State Board of
 Education shall ensure that at least six advanced career and
 technology education courses, including a course in personal
 financial literacy that is consistent with Section 28.0021 and
 satisfies statistics, are approved to satisfy a fourth credit in
 mathematics required for high school graduation.
 (b)  Not later than January 1, 2015, the commissioner shall
 review and report to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the
 speaker of the house of representatives, and the presiding officer
 of each standing committee of the legislature with primary
 responsibility over public primary and secondary education
 regarding the progress of increasing the number of courses approved
 for the career and technology education curriculum. The
 commissioner shall include in the report a detailed description of
 any new courses, including instructional materials and required
 equipment, if any.
 (c)  This section expires September 1, 2015.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *