Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2201 Enrolled / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.B. No. 2201


 AN ACT
 relating to increasing the courses offered in the career and
 technology education curriculum.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 28, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 28.00222 to read as follows:
 Sec. 28.00222.  INCREASE IN ADVANCED TECHNOLOGY AND
 CAREER-RELATED COURSES. (a) Not later than September 1, 2014, the
 State Board of Education shall ensure that at least six advanced
 career and technology education or technology applications
 courses, including a course in personal financial literacy that is
 consistent with Section 28.0021, are approved to satisfy a fourth
 credit in mathematics required for high school graduation.
 (b)  Not later than January 1, 2015, the commissioner shall
 review and report to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the
 speaker of the house of representatives, and the presiding officer
 of each standing committee of the legislature with primary
 responsibility over public primary and secondary education
 regarding the progress of increasing the number of courses approved
 for the career and technology education or technology applications
 curriculum. The commissioner shall include in the report a
 detailed description of any new courses, including instructional
 materials and required equipment, if any.
 (c)  This section expires September 1, 2015.
 SECTION 2.
 Section 28.025(b-2), Education Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (b-2)  In adopting rules under Subsection (b-1), the State
 Board of Education shall allow a student to comply with the
 curriculum requirements for the third and fourth [a] mathematics
 credits [course] under Subsection (b-1)(1) [taken after the
 successful completion of Algebra I and geometry and either after
 the successful completion of or concurrently with Algebra II] or
 the third and fourth [a] science credits [course] under Subsection
 (b-1)(1) [taken after the successful completion of biology and
 chemistry and either after the successful completion of or
 concurrently with physics] by successfully completing an advanced
 career and technical course designated by the State Board of
 Education as containing substantively similar and rigorous
 academic content. [A student may use the option provided by this
 subsection for not more than two courses.]
 SECTION 3.  Section 28.027(b), Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (b)  The State Board of Education shall establish a process
 under which an applied STEM course may be reviewed and approved for
 purposes of satisfying the mathematics and science curriculum
 requirements for the recommended high school program imposed under
 Section 28.025(b-1)(1)(A) through substitution of the applied STEM
 course for a specific mathematics or science course otherwise
 required under the recommended high school program [and completed
 during the student's fourth year of mathematics or science course
 work]. The State Board of Education may only approve a course to
 substitute for a mathematics course taken after successful
 completion of Algebra I and geometry [and after successful
 completion of or concurrently with Algebra II]. The State Board of
 Education may only approve a course to substitute for a science
 course taken after successful completion of biology [and chemistry
 and after successful completion of or concurrently with physics].
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2201 was passed by the House on May 9,
 2013, by the following vote:  Yeas 144, Nays 0, 2 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 2201 on May 23, 2013, by the following vote:  Yeas 146, Nays 0,
 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2201 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 21, 2013, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays
 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor