Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2294 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Kuempel, Lucio III (Senate Sponsor - Carona) H.B. No. 2294
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2013;
 May 7, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Business
 and Commerce; May 16, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 1, one
 present not voting; May 16, 2013, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2294 By:  Carona


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an exemption from air conditioning and refrigeration
 contracting regulation for installation of a thermostat.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1302.002(2), Occupations Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (2)  "Air conditioning and refrigeration contracting"
 means performing or offering to perform the design, installation,
 construction, repair, maintenance, service, or modification of
 equipment or a product in an environmental air conditioning system,
 a commercial refrigeration system, or a process cooling or heating
 system. Notwithstanding any other provision of this chapter, the
 term "air conditioning and refrigeration contracting" does not
 include the installation, repair, replacement, or modification of a
 thermostat or other temperature control interface by a person
 licensed or registered under Chapter 1702 of this code.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *