Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2305 Comm Sub / Bill

                    By: Rodriguez of Travis (Senate Sponsor - Watson) H.B. No. 2305
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 9, 2013;
 May 9, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 15, 2013, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 15, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to motor vehicle inspection requirements for vehicles
 equipped with compressed natural gas containers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 548.104(d), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (d)  An inspection station or inspector may not issue an
 inspection certificate for a vehicle equipped with:
 (1)  a carburetion device permitting the use of
 liquefied gas alone or interchangeably with another fuel, unless a
 valid liquefied gas tax decal issued by the comptroller is attached
 to the lower right-hand corner of the front windshield of the
 vehicle on the passenger side; [or]
 (2)  a sunscreening device prohibited by Section
 547.613, except that the department by rule shall provide
 procedures for issuance of an inspection certificate for a vehicle
 exempt under Section 547.613(c); or
 (3)  a compressed natural gas container unless the
 owner demonstrates in accordance with department rules proof:
 (A)  that:
 (i)  the container has met the inspection
 requirements under 49 C.F.R. Section 571.304; and
 (ii)  the manufacturer's recommended service
 life for the container, as stated on the container label required by
 49 C.F.R. Section 571.304, has not expired; or
 (B)  that the vehicle is a fleet vehicle for which
 the fleet operator employs a technician certified to inspect the
 container.
 SECTION 2.  (a)  Not later than January 1, 2014, the
 Department of Public Safety shall adopt rules relating to the proof
 required by Section 548.104(d), Transportation Code, as amended by
 this Act.
 (b)  The change in law made by Section 548.104(d),
 Transportation Code, as amended by this Act, applies only to a
 vehicle inspected on or after September 1, 2014.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *