Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2318 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Aycock (Senate Sponsor - Seliger) H.B. No. 2318
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2013;
 May 7, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 15, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 May 15, 2013, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2318 By:  Seliger


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to public school educator preparation and alternative
 certification programs.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 21, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 21.0453 to read as follows:
 Sec. 21.0453.  INFORMATION FOR CANDIDATES FOR TEACHER
 CERTIFICATION. (a) The board shall require an educator
 preparation program to provide candidates for teacher
 certification with information concerning the following:
 (1)  skills and responsibilities required of teachers;
 (2)  expectations for student performance based on
 state standards;
 (3)  the current supply of and demand for teachers in
 this state;
 (4)  the importance of developing classroom management
 skills; and
 (5)  the state's framework for appraisal of teachers
 and principals.
 (b)  The board may propose rules as necessary for
 administration of this section, including rules to ensure that
 accurate and consistent information is provided by all educator
 preparation programs.
 SECTION 2.  Section 21.048(a), Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 21.048.  CERTIFICATION EXAMINATIONS. (a) The board
 shall propose rules prescribing comprehensive examinations for
 each class of certificate issued by the board. The commissioner
 shall determine the satisfactory level of performance required for
 each certification examination. For the issuance of a generalist
 certificate, the commissioner shall require a satisfactory level of
 examination performance in each core subject covered by the
 examination.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter B, Chapter 21, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 21.061 to read as follows:
 Sec. 21.061.  REVIEW AND UPDATING OF EDUCATOR PREPARATION
 PROGRAMS. The board shall, after consulting with appropriate
 higher education faculty and public school teachers and
 administrators and soliciting advice from other interested persons
 with relevant knowledge and experience, develop and carry out a
 process for reviewing and, as necessary, updating standards and
 requirements for educator preparation programs.
 SECTION 4.  The State Board for Educator Certification shall
 complete an initial review of and implement any updated standards
 and requirements for educator preparation and alternative
 certification programs as required by Section 21.061, Education
 Code, as added by this Act, not later than September 1, 2014.
 SECTION 5.  Not later than January 1, 2014, the commissioner
 of education shall determine performance levels for certification
 examinations as provided by Section 21.048(a), Education Code, as
 amended by this Act.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *