Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2320 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 83RD LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            April 2, 2013      TO: Honorable Joseph Pickett, Chair, House Committee on Homeland Security & Public Safety      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB2320 by Parker (Relating to establishing a pilot program for driver education schools to administer certain driver's license examinations; authorizing fees.), As Introduced    No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.  The bill would amend the Transportation Code, Chapter 521 to require the Department of Public Safety (DPS) to establish and monitor a pilot program that permits commercial driver education schools to administer driving tests in counties with a population of at least 662,000 and that are adjacent to three or more counties with a population of 782,000 or more. According to DPS, the population criteria stated in this bill allows only Denton County to participate in the pilot program. The bill would permit the agency to set a fee for commerical driver education programs to participate in the pilot to offset program costs. The pilot program expires September 1, 2017. The bill requires DPS to adopt rules for the pilot by January 1, 2014. The bill would take effect September 1, 2013. DPS estimates that there would be a cost associated with implementing provisions of the bill. It is anticipated that the costs could be absorbed within current agency resources. In addition, the costs could be offset by the fees permitted under the bill's provisions. The agency anticipates indeterminate fee revenues due to uncertainty about the number of customers that would opt to take a driving test at a commercial school rather than at DPS. The Texas Education Agency (TEA) does not anticipate a fiscal impact as a result of changes made by the bill.  Local Government Impact Because the bill would not have statewide impact on units of local government of the same type or class, no comment from this office is required by the rules of the House/Senate as to its probable fiscal implication on units of local government.    Source Agencies:405 Department of Public Safety, 701 Central Education Agency   LBB Staff:  UP, ESi, JI, JJO, KKR    

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 83RD LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
April 2, 2013





  TO: Honorable Joseph Pickett, Chair, House Committee on Homeland Security & Public Safety      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB2320 by Parker (Relating to establishing a pilot program for driver education schools to administer certain driver's license examinations; authorizing fees.), As Introduced  

TO: Honorable Joseph Pickett, Chair, House Committee on Homeland Security & Public Safety
FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB2320 by Parker (Relating to establishing a pilot program for driver education schools to administer certain driver's license examinations; authorizing fees.), As Introduced

 Honorable Joseph Pickett, Chair, House Committee on Homeland Security & Public Safety 

 Honorable Joseph Pickett, Chair, House Committee on Homeland Security & Public Safety 

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB2320 by Parker (Relating to establishing a pilot program for driver education schools to administer certain driver's license examinations; authorizing fees.), As Introduced

HB2320 by Parker (Relating to establishing a pilot program for driver education schools to administer certain driver's license examinations; authorizing fees.), As Introduced



No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.



The bill would amend the Transportation Code, Chapter 521 to require the Department of Public Safety (DPS) to establish and monitor a pilot program that permits commercial driver education schools to administer driving tests in counties with a population of at least 662,000 and that are adjacent to three or more counties with a population of 782,000 or more. According to DPS, the population criteria stated in this bill allows only Denton County to participate in the pilot program. The bill would permit the agency to set a fee for commerical driver education programs to participate in the pilot to offset program costs. The pilot program expires September 1, 2017. The bill requires DPS to adopt rules for the pilot by January 1, 2014. The bill would take effect September 1, 2013. DPS estimates that there would be a cost associated with implementing provisions of the bill. It is anticipated that the costs could be absorbed within current agency resources. In addition, the costs could be offset by the fees permitted under the bill's provisions. The agency anticipates indeterminate fee revenues due to uncertainty about the number of customers that would opt to take a driving test at a commercial school rather than at DPS. The Texas Education Agency (TEA) does not anticipate a fiscal impact as a result of changes made by the bill. 

The bill would amend the Transportation Code, Chapter 521 to require the Department of Public Safety (DPS) to establish and monitor a pilot program that permits commercial driver education schools to administer driving tests in counties with a population of at least 662,000 and that are adjacent to three or more counties with a population of 782,000 or more. According to DPS, the population criteria stated in this bill allows only Denton County to participate in the pilot program. The bill would permit the agency to set a fee for commerical driver education programs to participate in the pilot to offset program costs.

The pilot program expires September 1, 2017. The bill requires DPS to adopt rules for the pilot by January 1, 2014. The bill would take effect September 1, 2013.

DPS estimates that there would be a cost associated with implementing provisions of the bill. It is anticipated that the costs could be absorbed within current agency resources. In addition, the costs could be offset by the fees permitted under the bill's provisions. The agency anticipates indeterminate fee revenues due to uncertainty about the number of customers that would opt to take a driving test at a commercial school rather than at DPS.

The Texas Education Agency (TEA) does not anticipate a fiscal impact as a result of changes made by the bill. 

Local Government Impact

Because the bill would not have statewide impact on units of local government of the same type or class, no comment from this office is required by the rules of the House/Senate as to its probable fiscal implication on units of local government.

Source Agencies: 405 Department of Public Safety, 701 Central Education Agency

405 Department of Public Safety, 701 Central Education Agency

LBB Staff: UP, ESi, JI, JJO, KKR

 UP, ESi, JI, JJO, KKR