Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2342 Comm Sub / Bill

                    83R23418 SCL-D
 By: Zedler, et al. H.B. No. 2342
 Substitute the following for H.B. No. 2342:
 By:  Geren C.S.H.B. No. 2342


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the research, collection, and use of adult stem cells.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle H, Title 3, Education Code, is amended
 by adding Chapter 156 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 156. ADULT STEM CELL RESEARCH PROGRAM
 Sec. 156.001.  DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1)  "Adult stem cell" means an undifferentiated cell
 that is:
 (A)  found in differentiated tissue; and
 (B)  able to renew itself and differentiate to
 yield all or nearly all of the specialized cell types of the tissue
 from which the cell originated.
 (2)  "Consortium" means the Texas Adult Stem Cell
 Research Consortium.
 (3)  "Institution of higher education" means an
 institution of higher education as defined by Section 61.003 or a
 private college or university that receives state funds.
 (4)  "Program" means the adult stem cell research
 program established under this chapter.
 (5)  "Research coordinating board" means the Texas
 Adult Stem Cell Research Coordinating Board.
 Sec. 156.002.  COMPOSITION OF RESEARCH COORDINATING BOARD.
 (a)  The Texas Adult Stem Cell Research Coordinating Board is
 composed of seven members appointed as follows:
 (1)  three members who are interested persons,
 including at least one person who represents an institution of
 higher education, appointed by the governor;
 (2)  two members who are interested persons appointed
 by the lieutenant governor; and
 (3)  two members who are interested persons appointed
 by the speaker of the house of representatives.
 (b)  The governor shall designate as the presiding officer of
 the research coordinating board a board member appointed under
 Subsection (a)(1) who represents an institution of higher
 education. The presiding officer serves in that capacity at the
 will of the governor.
 (c)  The members of the research coordinating board serve
 staggered six-year terms. If a vacancy occurs on the board, the
 appropriate appointing authority shall appoint, in the same manner
 as the original appointment, another person to serve for the
 remainder of the unexpired term.
 Sec. 156.003.  CONFLICT OF INTEREST.  (a)  In this section,
 "Texas trade association" means a cooperative and voluntarily
 joined association of business or professional competitors in this
 state designed to assist its members and its industry or profession
 in dealing with mutual business or professional problems and in
 promoting their common interest.
 (b)  A person may not be a member of the research
 coordinating board if:
 (1)  the person is an officer, employee, or paid
 consultant of a Texas trade association in the field of medicine;
 (2)  the person's spouse is an officer, manager, or paid
 consultant of a Texas trade association in the field of medicine; or
 (3)  the person is a member of the Texas Higher
 Education Coordinating Board.
 (c)  A person may not be a member of the research
 coordinating board if the person is required to register as a
 lobbyist under Chapter 305, Government Code, because of the
 person's activities for compensation on behalf of a profession
 related to the operation of the board.
 Sec. 156.004.  COMPOSITION OF CONSORTIUM.  (a)  The research
 coordinating board shall establish the Texas Adult Stem Cell
 Research Consortium.
 (b)  The consortium is composed of participating
 institutions of higher education and businesses that:
 (1)  accept public money for adult stem cell research;
 or
 (2)  otherwise agree to participate in the consortium.
 Sec. 156.005.  ADMINISTRATION OF PROGRAM; GUIDELINES AND
 PROCEDURES. (a) The research coordinating board shall administer
 the program to:
 (1)  make grants and loans to consortium members for:
 (A)  adult stem cell research projects, including
 projects to develop therapies, protocols, or medical procedures
 involving adult stem cells;
 (B)  the development of facilities to be used
 solely for adult stem cell research projects; and
 (C)  the commercialization of products or
 technology involving adult stem cell research and treatments;
 (2)  support consortium members in all stages of the
 process of developing treatments and cures based on adult stem cell
 research, beginning with initial laboratory research through
 successful clinical trials;
 (3)  establish appropriate regulatory standards and
 oversight bodies for:
 (A)  adult stem cell research conducted by
 consortium members; and
 (B)  the development of facilities for consortium
 members conducting adult stem cell research; and
 (4)  assist consortium members in applying for grants
 or loans under the program.
 (b)  The research coordinating board shall develop research
 priorities, guidelines, and procedures for providing grants and
 loans for specific research projects conducted by consortium
 members.  The priorities, guidelines, and procedures must require
 the grants and loans to be made on a competitive, peer review basis.
 Sec. 156.006.  FUNDING.  The program may be funded by gifts,
 grants, and donations described by Section 156.007.
 Sec. 156.007.  GIFTS, GRANTS, AND DONATIONS. The consortium
 shall solicit, and the research coordinating board may accept on
 behalf of the consortium, a gift, grant, or donation made from any
 public or private source for the purpose of promoting adult stem
 cell research or commercialization.
 Sec. 156.008.  BIENNIAL REPORT. Not later than September 1
 of each even-numbered year, the research coordinating board shall
 submit a report of the board's activities and recommendations to
 the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board and to the governor,
 the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of
 representatives, and the presiding officer of each legislative
 standing committee or subcommittee with jurisdiction over higher
 education.
 SECTION 2.  Section 162.001, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subdivision (4) to read as follows:
 (4)  "Adult stem cell" means an undifferentiated cell
 that is:
 (A)  found in differentiated tissue; and
 (B)  able to renew itself and differentiate to
 yield all or nearly all of the specialized cell types of the tissue
 from which the cell originated.
 SECTION 3.  Chapter 162, Health and Safety Code, is amended
 by adding Section 162.020 to read as follows:
 Sec. 162.020.  ADULT STEM CELL COLLECTION. Blood obtained
 by a blood bank may be used for the collection of adult stem cells if
 the donor consents in writing to that use.
 SECTION 4.  Section 241.003, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by amending Subdivision (1) and adding Subdivision (1-a) to
 read as follows:
 (1)  "Adult stem cell" has the meaning assigned by
 Section 162.001.
 (1-a)  "Advanced practice nurse" means a registered
 nurse recognized as an advanced practice nurse by the Texas Board of
 Nursing.
 SECTION 5.  Subchapter A, Chapter 241, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 241.009 to read as follows:
 Sec. 241.009.  USE OF ADULT STEM CELLS. A hospital may use
 adult stem cells in a procedure if a physician providing services at
 the hospital determines that the use of adult stem cells in the
 procedure is appropriate and the patient consents in writing to the
 use.
 SECTION 6.  (a)  As soon as practicable after the effective
 date of this Act, the governor, lieutenant governor, and speaker of
 the house of representatives shall appoint members to the Texas
 Adult Stem Cell Research Coordinating Board, as required by Section
 156.002, Education Code, as added by this Act, as follows:
 (1)  the governor shall appoint one member to a term
 expiring February 1, 2015, one member to a term expiring February 1,
 2017, and one member to a term expiring February 1, 2019;
 (2)  the lieutenant governor shall appoint one member
 to a term expiring February 1, 2017, and one member to a term
 expiring February 1, 2019; and
 (3)  the speaker of the house of representatives shall
 appoint one member to a term expiring February 1, 2017, and one
 member to a term expiring February 1, 2019.
 (b)  Not later than September 1, 2014, the Texas Adult Stem
 Cell Research Coordinating Board shall submit the first report of
 the board's activities and recommendations as required by Chapter
 156, Education Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 7.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.