Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2362 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Keffer (Senate Sponsor - Birdwell) H.B. No. 2362
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2013;
 May 9, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources; May 17, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 10, Nays 1;
 May 17, 2013, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2362 By:  Estes


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the efficiency review of river authorities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter G, Chapter 49, Water Code, is amended
 by adding Section 49.1991 to read as follows:
 Sec. 49.1991.  EFFICIENCY REVIEW OF RIVER AUTHORITIES. A
 district that is a river authority is subject to an efficiency
 review by the Legislative Budget Board.
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 322, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Section 322.0171 to read as follows:
 Sec. 322.0171.  EFFICIENCY REVIEW OF RIVER AUTHORITIES. (a)
 The board periodically may review and analyze the effectiveness and
 efficiency of the policies, management, fiscal affairs, and
 operations of a river authority.
 (b)  The board shall report the findings of a review and
 analysis to the governor and the legislature.
 (c)  Until the board has completed a review and analysis
 under this section, all information, documentary or otherwise,
 prepared or maintained in conducting the review and analysis or
 preparing the review report, including intra-agency and
 interagency communications and drafts of the review report or
 portions of those drafts, is excepted from required public
 disclosure as audit working papers under Section 552.116. This
 subsection does not affect whether information described by this
 subsection is confidential or excepted from required public
 disclosure under a law other than Section 552.116.
 SECTION 3.  The Legislative Budget Board shall conduct an
 efficiency review authorized by Section 322.0171, Government Code,
 as added by this Act, of both the Lower Colorado River Authority and
 the Brazos River Authority and report the findings of the review and
 analysis to the governor and the legislature not later than
 December 31, 2015.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *