Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB242 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Otto (Senate Sponsor - Hegar) H.B. No. 242
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 4, 2013;
 April 9, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 10, 2013, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 10, 2013, sent to
 printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the requirement that certain ad valorem tax-related
 notices be delivered to a property owner by certified mail.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1.07(d), Tax Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 (d)  A notice required by Section 11.45(d), 23.44(d),
 23.46(c), 23.54(e), 23.541(c), 23.55(e), 23.57(d), 23.76(e),
 23.79(d), or 23.85(d) must be sent by certified mail.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2014.
 * * * * *