Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2447 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Martinez (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa) H.B. No. 2447
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2013;
 May 9, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Business
 and Commerce; May 16, 2013, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 1; May 16, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the sale and advertisement of portable fire
 extinguishers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle C, Title 9, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Chapter 797 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 797. PORTABLE FIRE EXTINGUISHERS
 Sec. 797.001.  DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1)  "NFPA" means the National Fire Protection
 Association.
 (2)  "Portable fire extinguisher" means a device that
 contains liquid, powder, or gases for suppressing or extinguishing
 fires.
 Sec. 797.002.  PORTABLE FIRE EXTINGUISHERS. A person may
 not use the term "portable fire extinguisher" or "fire
 extinguisher" in the sale or advertisement of an aerosol fire
 suppression device or similar fire suppression device unless the
 device conforms to NFPA Standard 10 (2010), "Standard for Portable
 Fire Extinguishers," or a successor standard adopted by the
 commissioner of insurance that is at least as stringent as the NFPA
 Standard 10, and is specifically listed for that use by a testing
 laboratory approved by the Texas Department of Insurance.
 SECTION 2. Section 6001.001, Insurance Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 6001.001.  PURPOSE. The purpose of this chapter is to
 safeguard lives and property by:
 (1)  regulating:
 (A)  the leasing, selling, installing, and
 servicing of portable fire extinguishers; and
 (B)  the planning, certifying, installing, and
 servicing of fixed fire extinguisher systems; and
 (2)  prohibiting portable fire extinguishers, fixed
 fire extinguisher systems, or extinguisher equipment that is not
 [labeled or] listed by a testing laboratory approved by the
 department.
 SECTION 3. Section 6001.156(a), Insurance Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  The licensing provisions of this chapter do not apply
 to:
 (1)  the filling or charging of a portable fire
 extinguisher by the manufacturer before initial sale of the fire
 extinguisher;
 (2)  the servicing by a firm of the firm's portable fire
 extinguishers or fixed systems by  the firm's personnel who are
 specially trained for that servicing;
 (2-a)  the inspection of a firm's portable fire
 extinguisher by a person who is:
 (A)  specially trained to perform portable fire
 extinguisher inspections; and
 (B)  under contract with the firm for that
 purpose;
 (3)  the installation of portable fire extinguishers in
 a building by the building owner, the owner's managing agent, or an
 employee of the building owner or the owner's managing agent;
 (4)  the installation or servicing of water sprinkler
 systems installed in compliance with the National Fire Protection
 Association's Standards for the Installation of Sprinkler Systems;
 (5)  a firm that is engaged in the retail or wholesale
 sale of portable fire extinguishers that carry the [an approval
 label or] listing of a testing laboratory approved by the
 department, but that is not engaged in the installation or
 servicing of those extinguishers;
 (6)  a fire department that services portable fire
 extinguishers as a public service without charge, if the members of
 the fire department are trained in the proper servicing of the fire
 extinguishers;
 (7)  a firm that is a party to a contract under which:
 (A)  the installation of portable fire
 extinguishers or a fixed fire extinguisher system is performed
 under the direct supervision of and certified by a firm
 appropriately registered to install and certify portable
 extinguishers or fixed systems; and
 (B)  the registered firm assumes full
 responsibility for the installation; or
 (8)  an engineer licensed under Chapter 1001,
 Occupations Code, while acting solely in the engineer's
 professional capacity.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *