Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2448 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Turner of Harris (Senate Sponsor - Whitmire) H.B. No. 2448
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2013;
 May 7, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher
 Education; May 20, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0;
 May 20, 2013, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2448 By:  Watson


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to tuition for certain students residing outside of a
 junior college district.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 130.0032, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (b-1) to read as follows:
 (b-1)  The governing board of a public junior college
 district that includes at least six campuses shall allow a person
 who resides outside the district and in the taxing district of a
 contiguous public junior college district to pay tuition and fees
 at the rate applicable to a student who resides in the district for
 enrollment at a campus located within an area in which the person
 resides that, as of January 1, 2013, is designated as a super
 neighborhood by a municipality with a population greater than two
 million.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *