By: Turner of Harris (Senate Sponsor - Whitmire) H.B. No. 2448 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2013; May 7, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education; May 20, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 20, 2013, sent to printer.) COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2448 By: Watson A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to tuition for certain students residing outside of a junior college district. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 130.0032, Education Code, is amended by adding Subsection (b-1) to read as follows: (b-1) The governing board of a public junior college district that includes at least six campuses shall allow a person who resides outside the district and in the taxing district of a contiguous public junior college district to pay tuition and fees at the rate applicable to a student who resides in the district for enrollment at a campus located within an area in which the person resides that, as of January 1, 2013, is designated as a super neighborhood by a municipality with a population greater than two million. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2013. * * * * *