H.B. No. 2448 AN ACT relating to tuition for certain students residing outside of a junior college district. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 130.0032, Education Code, is amended by adding Subsection (b-1) to read as follows: (b-1) The governing board of a public junior college district that includes at least six campuses shall allow a person who resides outside the district and in the taxing district of a contiguous public junior college district to pay tuition and fees at the rate applicable to a student who resides in the district for enrollment at a campus located within an area in which the person resides that, as of January 1, 2013, is designated as a super neighborhood by a municipality with a population greater than two million. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2013. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 2448 was passed by the House on May 2, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 146, Nays 1, 2 present, not voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. No. 2448 on May 23, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 146, Nays 1, 2 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 2448 was passed by the Senate, with amendments, on May 21, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: __________________ Date __________________ Governor