Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2466 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    83R10526 JTS-F
 By: Farias H.B. No. 2466


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the issuance of specialty license plates for Vietnam
 veterans.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 504.312(a), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The department shall issue:
 (1)  specialty license plates that include the Vietnam
 Service Medal image to a veteran:
 (A)  who served in the United States armed forces
 in the Republic of Vietnam or waters contiguous to the Republic of
 Vietnam during the period beginning on February 28, 1961, and
 ending on May 7, 1975; and
 (B)  whose United States Department of Defense
 Form DD-214 lists either the Armed Forces Expeditionary Medal
 (Vietnam) or the Vietnam Service Medal; or
 (2)  specialty license plates that include the National
 Defense Service Medal image to a veteran:
 (A)  who served in the United States armed forces
 during the period beginning on August 5, 1964, and ending on May 7,
 1975; and
 (B)  whose United States Department of Defense
 Form DD-214 lists the National Defense Service Medal but not a medal
 described by Subdivision (1) [specialty license plates for persons
 who served in the United States armed forces during:
 [(1)     the period beginning on February 28, 1961, and
 ending on May 7, 1975, in the case of a veteran who served in the
 Republic of Vietnam during that period; or
 [(2)     the period beginning on August 5, 1964, and
 ending on May 7, 1975, in all other cases].
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.