Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2473 Comm Sub / Bill

                    By: Deshotel (Senate Sponsor - Williams) H.B. No. 2473
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2013;
 May 7, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Economic
 Development; May 16, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0;
 May 16, 2013, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2473 By:  Deuell


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to use of sales and use tax proceeds by economic
 development corporations in connection with housing facilities for
 certain institutions of higher education.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter D, Chapter 501, Local Government
 Code, is amended by adding Section 501.163 to read as follows:
 Sec. 501.163.  USE OF TAX REVENUE FOR HOUSING FACILITIES FOR
 PUBLIC STATE COLLEGES. (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Housing facility" has the meaning assigned by
 Section 53.02, Education Code.
 (2)  "Public state college" has the meaning assigned by
 Section 61.003, Education Code.
 (b)  A corporation may spend tax revenue received under this
 subtitle for expenditures that are for the development or
 construction of housing facilities on or adjacent to the campus of a
 public state college.
 (c)  This section expires September 1, 2017.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *