H.B. No. 2473 AN ACT relating to use of sales and use tax proceeds by economic development corporations in connection with housing facilities for certain institutions of higher education. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter D, Chapter 501, Local Government Code, is amended by adding Section 501.163 to read as follows: Sec. 501.163. USE OF TAX REVENUE FOR HOUSING FACILITIES FOR PUBLIC STATE COLLEGES. (a) In this section: (1) "Housing facility" has the meaning assigned by Section 53.02, Education Code. (2) "Public state college" has the meaning assigned by Section 61.003, Education Code. (b) A corporation may spend tax revenue received under this subtitle for expenditures that are for the development or construction of housing facilities on or adjacent to the campus of a public state college. (c) This section expires September 1, 2017. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2013. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 2473 was passed by the House on May 4, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 70, Nays 69, 3 present, not voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. No. 2473 on May 21, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 112, Nays 34, 3 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 2473 was passed by the Senate, with amendments, on May 17, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 26, Nays 5. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: __________________ Date __________________ Governor