Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2482 Introduced / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    83R6985 DDT-D
 By: Alvarado H.B. No. 2482


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a study to determine the reasons major manufacturers
 have chosen to invest in other states after considering development
 in this state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  In this Act, "major manufacturer" means a person
 that:
 (1)  is engaged in the business of manufacturing;
 (2)  invested $500,000 or more in developing,
 expanding, or maintaining manufacturing operations in another
 state after September 1, 2011, and before September 1, 2014; and
 (3)  was offered economic incentives by the state or a
 local government related to developing, expanding, or maintaining
 manufacturing operations in this state before choosing to make that
 investment.
 SECTION 2.  The comptroller of public accounts shall conduct
 a study on the reasons major manufacturers have chosen to invest in
 other states after the manufacturers were offered economic
 incentives by the state or a local government to develop in this
 state. The comptroller's office shall solicit interviews with an
 executive of each major manufacturer that declined the incentives.
 The interviews must address recommendations for this state to
 effectively compete with other states in promoting manufacturing
 development.
 SECTION 3.  Not later than December 1, 2014, the comptroller
 shall provide a report on the results of the study, including an
 analysis of the results, to the speaker of the house of
 representatives, the lieutenant governor, the governor, and each
 standing committee of the legislature that has relevant
 jurisdiction.
 SECTION 4.  This Act expires January 1, 2015.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.