Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2493 Introduced / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    83R2591 JXC-D
 By: Harper-Brown H.B. No. 2493


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of the Texas Department of Transportation
 to enter into a comprehensive development agreement regarding State
 Highway 114.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 223.201(f), (i), (j), and (k),
 Transportation Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (f)  The department may enter into a comprehensive
 development agreement only for all or part of:
 (1)  the State Highway 99 (Grand Parkway) project;
 (2)  the Interstate Highway 35E managed lanes project
 in Dallas and Denton Counties from Interstate Highway 635 to U.S.
 Highway 380;
 (3)  the North Tarrant Express project in Tarrant and
 Dallas Counties, including:
 (A)  on State Highway 183 from State Highway 121
 to State Highway 161 (Segment 2E);
 (B)  on Interstate Highway 35W from Interstate
 Highway 30 to State Highway 114 (Segments 3A, 3B, and 3C); and
 (C)  on Interstate Highway 820 from State Highway
 183 North to south of Randol Mill Road (Segment 4);
 (4)  the State Highway 183 managed lanes project in
 Dallas County from State Highway 161 to Interstate Highway 35E;
 (5)  the State Highway 249 project in Harris and
 Montgomery Counties from Spring Cypress Road to Farm-to-Market Road
 1774;
 (6)  the State Highway 288 project in Brazoria County
 and Harris County; [and]
 (7)  the U.S. Highway 290 Hempstead managed lanes
 project in Harris County from Interstate Highway 610 to State
 Highway 99; and
 (8)  the State Highway 114 managed lanes project from
 State Highway 183 to State Highway 121.
 (i)  The authority to enter into a comprehensive development
 agreement for a project described by Subsection (f), other than the
 State Highway 99 (Grand Parkway) project or the State Highway 114
 managed lanes project expires August 31, 2015.
 (j)  Before the department may enter into a comprehensive
 development agreement under Subsection (f), the department must:
 (1)  obtain, not later than August 31, 2013, the
 appropriate environmental clearance for any project other than the
 State Highway 99 (Grand Parkway) project or the State Highway 114
 managed lanes project; and
 (2)  present to the commission a full financial plan
 for the project, including costing methodology and cost proposals.
 (k)  Not later than December 1, 2012, or December 1, 2014,
 for the State Highway 114 managed lanes project, the department
 shall present a report to the commission on the status of a project
 described by Subsection (f).  The report must include:
 (1)  the status of the project's environmental
 clearance;
 (2)  an explanation of any project delays; and
 (3)  if the procurement is not completed, the
 anticipated date for the completion of the procurement.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.