Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2537 Comm Sub / Bill

                    By: Geren (Senate Sponsor - Carona) H.B. No. 2537
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2013;
 May 7, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Business
 and Commerce; May 16, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 1;
 May 16, 2013, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2537 By:  Carona


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to production requirements for holders of winery permits.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 16, Alcoholic Beverage Code, is amended
 by adding Section 16.012 to read as follows:
 Sec. 16.012.  PRODUCTION REQUIREMENTS. (a)  This section
 does not apply to a holder of a winery permit described by Section
 16.09(i).
 (b)  The holder of a winery permit must produce or bottle and
 offer for sale at least 200 gallons of wine or fruit brandy annually
 beginning in the 12-month period preceding the first anniversary of
 the date the winery's original permit is issued.
 (b-1)  Notwithstanding Subsection (b), the holder of a
 winery permit issued before September 1, 2014, must produce or
 bottle and offer for sale at least 200 gallons of wine or fruit
 brandy annually beginning in the 12-month period preceding
 September 1, 2015. This subsection expires September 1, 2016.
 (c)  The production required by this section must be done at
 the permitted location or at a Texas winery owned and operated by
 the same permit holder.
 (d)  Failure to comply with this section constitutes grounds
 to cancel or suspend a winery permit or deny an application for
 renewal of a winery permit.
 SECTION 2.  Section 16.09, Alcoholic Beverage Code, is
 amended by adding Subsections (f), (g), (h), and (i) to read as
 follows:
 (f)  At least 51 percent by volume of the wine shipped under
 this section must be produced or bottled in this state:
 (1)  by the holder of a winery permit on the winery's
 premises or at another permitted location owned and operated by the
 permit holder;
 (2)  under an operating agreement authorized by Section
 16.05; or
 (3)  under an agreement with another winery permit
 holder for a bottling brand under an Alcohol and Tobacco Tax and
 Trade Bureau Basic Permit trade name application.
 (g)  The holder of a winery permit shall maintain complete
 records of each sale and delivery made under this section for at
 least five years from the date of the sale. The records shall be
 made available on request for inspection by the commission or any
 other appropriate state agency.
 (h)  The commission shall adopt rules requiring the holder of
 a winery permit to periodically file reports providing the
 commission with any information the commission determines is
 necessary to more efficiently and effectively enforce this section.
 At a minimum, the reports must specify:
 (1)  whether wine sold and delivered by the permit
 holder under this section was produced or bottled in this state; and
 (2)  whether the wine was:
 (A)  produced or bottled:
 (i)  by the holder of the winery permit on
 the winery's premises or at another permitted location owned and
 operated by the permit holder;
 (ii)  under an operating agreement
 authorized by Section 16.05; or
 (iii)  under an agreement with another
 winery permit holder for a bottling brand under an Alcohol and
 Tobacco Tax and Trade Bureau Basic Permit trade name application;
 or
 (B)  purchased from an authorized source.
 (i)  Subsection (f) does not apply to the holder of a winery
 permit issued on or before June 1, 2012, if at least 95 percent by
 volume of the wine shipped under that permit during 2012 had a
 personalized label that:
 (1)  contained a personal message, picture, or other
 artwork that was specific to the consumer who purchased the
 product; and
 (2)  was designed by the consumer and affixed by the
 permit holder at the licensed premises.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2014.
 * * * * *