Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2585 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Harper-Brown, et al. H.B. No. 2585
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2585By:  Eltife By:  Eltife
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2013;
 May 7, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Business
 and Commerce; May 15, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 May 15, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the reimbursement of utilities for relocation of
 utility facilities following improvement or construction of
 certain tolled highways.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 203.092(a-1), (a-2), and (a-3),
 Transportation Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a-1)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a)(3), the department and
 the utility shall share equally the cost of the relocation of a
 utility facility that is [made before September 1, 2013, and]
 required by the improvement of a nontolled highway to add one or
 more tolled lanes.  [This subsection expires September 1, 2013.]
 (a-2)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a)(3), the department and
 the utility shall share equally the cost of the relocation of a
 utility facility that is [made before September 1, 2013, and]
 required by the improvement of a nontolled highway that has been
 converted to a turnpike project or toll project.  [This subsection
 expires September 1, 2013.]
 (a-3)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a)(3), the department and
 the utility shall share equally the cost of the relocation of a
 utility facility that is [made before September 1, 2013, and]
 required by the construction on a new location of a turnpike project
 or toll project or the expansion of such a turnpike project or toll
 project.  [This subsection expires September 1, 2013.]
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect on the 91st day after the last day of the
 legislative session.
 * * * * *