Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2620 Comm Sub / Bill

                    By: Collier, Cortez (Senate Sponsor - Deuell) H.B. No. 2620
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2013;
 May 7, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
 and Human Services; May 15, 2013, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 15, 2013, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2620 By:  Deuell


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of a task force on domestic violence.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 32, Health and Safety Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter C to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER C. TASK FORCE ON DOMESTIC VIOLENCE
 Sec. 32.061.  DEFINITION. In this subchapter, "task force"
 means the task force on domestic violence.
 Sec. 32.062.  ESTABLISHMENT; PRESIDING OFFICER. (a) The
 task force is composed of 25 members appointed by the executive
 commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission as
 follows:
 (1)  four representatives of family violence centers,
 as defined by Section 51.002, Human Resources Code, from different
 geographic regions in this state, including both rural and urban
 areas;
 (2)  one representative of a statewide family violence
 advocacy organization;
 (3)  one representative of a statewide association of
 obstetricians and gynecologists;
 (4)  two representatives of the family and community
 health programs in the Department of State Health Services;
 (5)  one representative of a statewide sexual assault
 advocacy organization;
 (6)  one representative of the Health and Human
 Services Commission Texas Home Visiting Program;
 (7)  one representative of a statewide association of
 midwifery;
 (8)  one representative of a statewide family
 physician's association;
 (9)  one representative of a statewide nursing
 association;
 (10)  one representative of a statewide hospital
 association;
 (11)  one representative of a statewide pediatric
 medical association;
 (12)  one representative of a statewide medical
 association;
 (13)  one representative of The University of Texas
 School of Social Work Institute on Domestic Violence and Sexual
 Assault;
 (14)  one representative of The University of Texas
 School of Law Domestic Violence Clinic;
 (15)  one representative of the governor's EMS and
 Trauma Advisory Council;
 (16)  one representative of a Department of Family and
 Protective Services prevention and early intervention program;
 (17)  one representative of a statewide osteopathic
 medical association;
 (18)  one representative of a statewide association of
 community health centers;
 (19)  one representative of the office of the attorney
 general;
 (20)  one representative from a medical school or a
 teaching hospital in the state who is either an attending physician
 of the hospital or a faculty member of the medical school; and
 (21)  one representative of the Health and Human
 Services Commission's Family Violence Program.
 (b)  The executive commissioner of the Health and Human
 Services Commission shall appoint a task force member to serve as
 presiding officer of the task force.
 Sec. 32.063.  DUTIES OF TASK FORCE. The task force shall
 meet at the call of the presiding officer to:
 (1)  examine the impact of domestic violence on
 maternal and infant mortality, the health of mothers, and the
 health and development of fetuses, infants, and children;
 (2)  identify the health care services available to
 children age two and younger and mothers and explore opportunities
 for improving the ability of those services to address domestic
 violence;
 (3)  identify methods to effectively include domestic
 violence information and support in educational standards for
 educators and protocols for health care providers; and
 (4)  investigate and make recommendations relating to
 the coordination of health care services for children age two and
 younger and pregnant and postpartum women who are victims of
 domestic violence, including recommendations for improving early
 screening and detection and public awareness efforts.
 Sec. 32.064.  REPORT. Not later than September 1, 2015, the
 task force shall submit a report to the governor, the lieutenant
 governor, the speaker of the house of representatives, the
 presiding officers of the standing committees of the legislature
 having primary jurisdiction over health and human services, the
 executive commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission,
 and the commissioner of state health services containing:
 (1)  the findings and legislative, policy, and research
 recommendations of the task force; and
 (2)  a description of the activities of the task force.
 Sec. 32.065.  EXPIRATION. The task force is abolished and
 this subchapter expires January 1, 2016.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *