H.B. No. 2620 AN ACT relating to the creation of a task force on domestic violence. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Chapter 32, Health and Safety Code, is amended by adding Subchapter C to read as follows: SUBCHAPTER C. TASK FORCE ON DOMESTIC VIOLENCE Sec. 32.061. DEFINITION. In this subchapter, "task force" means the task force on domestic violence. Sec. 32.062. ESTABLISHMENT; PRESIDING OFFICER. (a) The task force is composed of 25 members appointed by the executive commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission as follows: (1) four representatives of family violence centers, as defined by Section 51.002, Human Resources Code, from different geographic regions in this state, including both rural and urban areas; (2) one representative of a statewide family violence advocacy organization; (3) one representative of a statewide association of obstetricians and gynecologists; (4) two representatives of the family and community health programs in the Department of State Health Services; (5) one representative of a statewide sexual assault advocacy organization; (6) one representative of the Health and Human Services Commission Texas Home Visiting Program; (7) one representative of a statewide association of midwifery; (8) one representative of a statewide family physician's association; (9) one representative of a statewide nursing association; (10) one representative of a statewide hospital association; (11) one representative of a statewide pediatric medical association; (12) one representative of a statewide medical association; (13) one representative of The University of Texas School of Social Work Institute on Domestic Violence and Sexual Assault; (14) one representative of The University of Texas School of Law Domestic Violence Clinic; (15) one representative of the governor's EMS and Trauma Advisory Council; (16) one representative of a Department of Family and Protective Services prevention and early intervention program; (17) one representative of a statewide osteopathic medical association; (18) one representative of a statewide association of community health centers; (19) one representative of the office of the attorney general; (20) one representative from a medical school or a teaching hospital in the state who is either an attending physician of the hospital or a faculty member of the medical school; and (21) one representative of the Health and Human Services Commission's Family Violence Program. (b) The executive commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall appoint a task force member to serve as presiding officer of the task force. Sec. 32.063. DUTIES OF TASK FORCE. The task force shall meet at the call of the presiding officer to: (1) examine the impact of domestic violence on maternal and infant mortality, the health of mothers, and the health and development of fetuses, infants, and children; (2) identify the health care services available to children age two and younger and mothers and explore opportunities for improving the ability of those services to address domestic violence; (3) identify methods to effectively include domestic violence information and support in educational standards for educators and protocols for health care providers; and (4) investigate and make recommendations relating to the coordination of health care services for children age two and younger and pregnant and postpartum women who are victims of domestic violence, including recommendations for improving early screening and detection and public awareness efforts. Sec. 32.064. REPORT. Not later than September 1, 2015, the task force shall submit a report to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of representatives, the presiding officers of the standing committees of the legislature having primary jurisdiction over health and human services, the executive commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission, and the commissioner of state health services containing: (1) the findings and legislative, policy, and research recommendations of the task force; and (2) a description of the activities of the task force. Sec. 32.065. EXPIRATION. The task force is abolished and this subchapter expires January 1, 2016. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2013. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 2620 was passed by the House on May 2, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 3, 2 present, not voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. No. 2620 on May 24, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 118, Nays 25, 2 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 2620 was passed by the Senate, with amendments, on May 22, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: __________________ Date __________________ Governor