Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2627 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Zedler (Senate Sponsor - Eltife) H.B. No. 2627
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2013;
 April 30, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
 and Human Services; May 13, 2013, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 13, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the issuance of remedial plans to resolve complaints
 filed with the Texas Optometry Board; authorizing a fee.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter K, Chapter 351, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 351.509 to read as follows:
 Sec. 351.509.  REMEDIAL PLAN. (a) The board may issue and
 establish the terms of a remedial plan to resolve the investigation
 of a complaint filed under this chapter.
 (b)  A remedial plan may not contain a provision that:
 (1)  revokes, suspends, limits, or restricts a person's
 license or other authorization to practice optometry or therapeutic
 optometry; or
 (2)  assesses an administrative penalty against a
 person.
 (c)  A remedial plan may not be imposed to resolve a
 complaint:
 (1)  concerning:
 (A)  a death;
 (B)  a hospitalization; or
 (C)  the commission of a felony; or
 (2)  in which the appropriate resolution may involve a
 restriction on the manner in which a license holder practices
 optometry or therapeutic optometry.
 (d)  The board may not issue a remedial plan to resolve a
 complaint against a license holder if the license holder has
 entered into a remedial plan with the board in the preceding 24
 months for the resolution of a different complaint filed under this
 chapter.
 (e)  If a license holder complies with and successfully
 completes the terms of a remedial plan, the board shall remove all
 records of the remedial plan from the board's records on the second
 anniversary of the date the license holder successfully completes
 the remedial plan.
 (f)  The board may assess a fee against a license holder
 participating in a remedial plan in an amount necessary to recover
 the costs of administering the plan.
 (g)  The board shall adopt rules necessary to implement this
 section.
 SECTION 2.  The Texas Optometry Board shall adopt rules
 under Section 351.509, Occupations Code, as added by this Act, not
 later than January 1, 2014.
 SECTION 3.  Section 351.509, Occupations Code, as added by
 this Act, applies only to a complaint under Chapter 351,
 Occupations Code, filed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 A complaint under Chapter 351, Occupations Code, filed before that
 date is governed by the law in effect on the date the complaint was
 filed, and that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *