Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2724 Introduced / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Otto H.B. No. 2724


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the conveyance of state property.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Not later than January 1, 2014 the Texas Board of
 Criminal Justice shall convey to the Board of Regents at the Texas
 State University System for use by Sam Houston State University the
 real property described by Subsection (e) of this section.
 (b)  The Texas Board of Criminal Justice shall convey the
 property by deed without warranty regarding covenants of title.
 (c)  The deed must include a provision that:
 (1)  Requires Sam Houston State University to use the
 property primarily for a governmental purpose; and
 (2)  indicates that title to the property will
 automatically revert to the Texas Board of Criminal Justice if Sam
 Houston State University fails to use the property primarily for a
 governmental purpose.
 (d)  The Texas Board of Criminal Justice shall retain custody
 of the deed after the deed is filed in the real property records of
 Walker County.
 City of Huntsville, P. GRAY SURVEY, Abstract No. 24, Walker County,
 Texas and being out of and a part of a called 515 acre tract as
 described in a Deed from Ed H. Cunningham, et al to the State of
 Texas, dated July 10, 1883 and recorded in Volume Y, Page 181, Deed
 Records, said 78.823 acre tract being more definitely described as
 follows:
 BEGINNING at the northeast corner of a called 5.00 acre
 tract, out of said 515 acre tract, as described in a Deed from the
 Texas Board of Criminal Justice, on behalf of the Texas Department
 of Criminal Justice, to the County of Walker (Veteran's Complex),
 dated October 29, 2003 and recorded in Volume 595, Page 210,
 Official Records, found a 5/8" iron rod with a plastic cap in the
 south right-of-way of State Highway 75, being a 50 foot strip
 (called 3.78 acres) conveyed to the State of Texas in Volume 209,
 Page 707, Deed Records, said iron rod having coordinates of
 N:10263383.58, E:3788833.74 and being the most northerly northwest
 corner of the herein described tract;
 THENCE S83°08'57"E, with the south right-of-way of said S.H.
 75, for a distance of 1245.10 feet to a called angle point of said
 3.78 acre tract (TxDOT Station 79+76.59), set a 5/8" iron rod, with
 a plastic cap;
 THENCE N70°17'06"E, continuing with the south right-of-way of
 said S.H. 75 for a distance of 95.23 feet to its dated February 19,
 1966 and recorded in Volume 198, Page 501, Deed Records, set a 5/8"
 iron rod with a plastic cap for the northeast corner of the herein
 described tract, from which a 5" square concrete monument, found
 for the northeast corner of said 515 acre tract, bears N02°32'37"W-
 551.88 feet;
 THENCE S02°32'37"E, with the east line of said 515 acre tract
 and the called west line of said Heaton tract, at 660.0 pass the
 apparent southwest corner of said Heaton tract, continuing for a
 total distance of 2649.68 feet to its intersection with the
 northeast right-of-way of Interstate Highway No. 45, as described
 in "Tract No. 1 (called 55.13 acres)" in a Right of Way Deed from the
 Texas Prison Board to the Texas State Highway Commission, dated
 July 19, 1957 and recorded in Volume 158, Page 177, Deed Records,
 set a 5/8" iron rod with a plastic cap at a fence corner post for the
 southeast corner of the herein described tract, from said iron rod a
 5" square concrete monument, found for the southeast corner of said
 515 acre tract, bears S02°32'37"E- 2574.60 feet;
 THENCE, with the northeast lines of said I.H. 45, as
 presently monumented, the following calls:
 1). N47°43'50"W- 1972.52 feet to a found TxDOT concrete
 monument;
 2). N49°39'48"W- 259.16 feet to a found TxDOT concrete
 monument;
 and 5). N55°10'12"W, at 356.2 feet pass a point in a creek for the
 south corner of a right-of-way easement (called 2.744 acres) from
 the Texas Board of Criminal Justice to the Texas Transportation
 Commission, dated January 6, 2000 and recorded in Volume 412, Page
 149, Official Records, continuing for a total distance of 404.59
 feet to a 5/8" iron rod, with a plastic cap, set for the southwest
 corner of the herein described tract;
 THENCE N29°54'57"E, crossing said right-of-way easement, at 28.58
 feet pass a northeasterly line of said easement, same being the
 south corner of a called 10.01 acre tract, out of said 515 acre
 tract, as described in a Deed from the County of Walker to the Texas
 Prison Museum, dated July 16, 2001 and recorded in Volume 466, Page
 755, Official Records, continuing with the southeast line of said
 10.01 acre tract, at 171.32 feet pass a point for the west corner of
 a sanitary sewer, drainage and road easement (called 0.455 acre) as
 described in a Deed from the Texas Board of Criminal Justice to the
 County of Walker, dated May 7, 2004 and recorded in Volume 634, Page
 550, Official Records, continuing with the common line of said
 10.01 acre and 0.455 acre tracts, for a total distance of 501.32
 feet to the southwest corner of said County of Walker 5.00 acre
 tract (Veteran's Complex), same being the northwest corner of said
 0.455 acre tract found a 5/8" iron rod with a plastic cap;
 THENCE N06°51'03"E, with the east line of said 5.00 acre
 tract, for a distance of 375.56 feet to the PLACE OF BEGINNING.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.