Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2738 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Elkins (Senate Sponsor - Ellis) H.B. No. 2738
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 15, 2013;
 April 17, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Government Organization; May 1, 2013, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6,
 Nays 0; May 1, 2013, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2738 By:  Garcia


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a study by the Department of Information Resources
 regarding state agency technology efficiency.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 2054, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter O to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER O.  LEGACY SYSTEMS STUDY
 Sec. 2054.551.  DEFINITION.  In this subchapter, "legacy
 system" means a computer system or application program that is
 operated with obsolete or inefficient hardware or software
 technology.
 Sec. 2054.552.  STUDY. (a)  The department shall conduct a
 study to identify legacy systems currently maintained by state
 agencies other than institutions of higher education. The study
 must include:
 (1)  an inventory of the systems maintained by
 state agencies;
 (2)  the annual cost and availability of resources
 to maintain the systems;
 (3)  the security risks related to use of the
 systems;
 (4)  if feasible, a cost estimate for updating the
 systems; and
 (5)  a plan for assessing and prioritizing
 statewide modernization projects to update or replace the systems.
 (b)  The department may contract with a private vendor to
 conduct the study.
 (c)  On request by the department, each state agency shall
 provide to the department the information necessary for the study.
 The department may require a state agency to clarify or validate
 information provided by the agency or related to the study.
 Sec. 2054.553.  REPORT.  Not later than October 1, 2014, the
 department shall submit a report on its findings from the study
 conducted under Section 2054.552 and recommendations for
 modernization of legacy systems to:
 (1)  the governor;
 (2)  the lieutenant governor;
 (3)  the speaker of the house of representatives;
 (4)  the House Technology Committee; and
 (5)  the Senate Committee on Government Organization.
 Sec. 2054.554.  EXPIRATION.  This subchapter expires August
 31, 2015.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *