H.B. No. 2738 AN ACT relating to a study by the Department of Information Resources regarding state agency technology efficiency. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Chapter 2054, Government Code, is amended by adding Subchapter O to read as follows: SUBCHAPTER O. LEGACY SYSTEMS STUDY Sec. 2054.551. DEFINITION. In this subchapter, "legacy system" means a computer system or application program that is operated with obsolete or inefficient hardware or software technology. Sec. 2054.552. STUDY. (a) The department shall conduct a study to identify legacy systems currently maintained by state agencies other than institutions of higher education. The study must include: (1) an inventory of the systems maintained by state agencies; (2) the annual cost and availability of resources to maintain the systems; (3) the security risks related to use of the systems; (4) if feasible, a cost estimate for updating the systems; and (5) a plan for assessing and prioritizing statewide modernization projects to update or replace the systems. (b) The department may contract with a private vendor to conduct the study. (c) On request by the department, each state agency shall provide to the department the information necessary for the study. The department may require a state agency to clarify or validate information provided by the agency or related to the study. Sec. 2054.553. REPORT. Not later than October 1, 2014, the department shall submit a report on its findings from the study conducted under Section 2054.552 and recommendations for modernization of legacy systems to: (1) the governor; (2) the lieutenant governor; (3) the speaker of the house of representatives; (4) the House Technology Committee; and (5) the Senate Committee on Government Organization. Sec. 2054.554. EXPIRATION. This subchapter expires August 31, 2015. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2013. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 2738 was passed by the House on April 11, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, 2 present, not voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. No. 2738 on May 13, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, 1 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 2738 was passed by the Senate, with amendments, on May 9, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: __________________ Date __________________ Governor