Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2767 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: King of Parker, Keffer, Lewis H.B. No. 2767
 (Senate Sponsor - Estes)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2013;
 May 13, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources; May 17, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 17, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the treatment and recycling for beneficial use of
 certain waste arising out of or incidental to the drilling for or
 production of oil or gas.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle D, Title 3, Natural Resources Code, is
 amended by adding Chapter 122 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 122. TREATMENT AND RECYCLING FOR BENEFICIAL USE OF CERTAIN
 OIL AND GAS WASTE
 Sec. 122.001.  DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1)  "Commission" means the Railroad Commission of
 Texas.
 (2)  "Fluid oil and gas waste" means waste containing
 salt or other mineralized substances, brine, hydraulic fracturing
 fluid, flowback water, produced water, or other fluid that arises
 out of or is incidental to the drilling for or production of oil or
 gas.
 Sec. 122.002.  OWNERSHIP OF CERTAIN OIL AND GAS WASTE
 TRANSFERRED FOR TREATMENT AND SUBSEQUENT BENEFICIAL USE. Unless
 otherwise expressly provided by a contract, bill of sale, or other
 legally binding document:
 (1)  when fluid oil and gas waste is transferred to a
 person who takes possession of that waste for the purpose of
 treating the waste for a subsequent beneficial use, the transferred
 material is considered to be the property of the person who takes
 possession of it for the purpose of treating the waste for
 subsequent beneficial use until the person transfers the waste or
 treated waste to another person for disposal or use; and
 (2)  when a person who takes possession of fluid oil and
 gas waste for the purpose of treating the waste for a subsequent
 beneficial use transfers possession of the treated product or any
 treatment byproduct to another person for the purpose of subsequent
 disposal or beneficial use, the transferred product or byproduct is
 considered to be the property of the person to whom the material is
 transferred.
 Sec. 122.003.  RESPONSIBILITY IN TORT. (a) Except as
 provided by Subsection (b), a person who takes possession of fluid
 oil and gas waste, produces from that waste a treated product
 generally considered in the oil and gas industry to be suitable for
 use in connection with the drilling for or production of oil or gas,
 and transfers the treated product to another person with the
 contractual understanding that the treated product will be used in
 connection with the drilling for or production of oil or gas is not
 liable in tort for a consequence of the subsequent use of that
 treated product by the person to whom the treated product is
 transferred or by another person.
 (b)  This section does not affect the liability of a person
 that treats fluid oil and gas waste for beneficial use in an action
 brought by a person for damages for personal injury, death, or
 property damage arising from exposure to fluid oil and gas waste or
 a treated product.
 Sec. 122.004.  COMMISSION RULES FOR TREATMENT AND BENEFICIAL
 USE. The commission shall adopt rules to govern the treatment and
 beneficial use of oil and gas waste.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *