Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2772 Enrolled / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.B. No. 2772


 AN ACT
 relating to an interim study regarding the method by which certain
 judicial officers are selected.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  INTERIM COMMITTEE; STUDY. (a)  The joint
 interim committee on judicial selection is established to study and
 review the method by which the following judicial officers are
 selected in this state:
 (1)  statutory county court judges, including
 statutory probate court judges;
 (2)  district judges; and
 (3)  appellate justices and judges.
 (b)  The study must consider:
 (1)  the fairness, effectiveness, and desirability of
 selecting a judicial officer described in Subsection (a) of this
 section through partisan elections;
 (2)  the fairness, effectiveness, and desirability of
 judicial selection methods proposed or adopted by other states; and
 (3)  the relative merits of alternative methods for
 selecting a judicial officer described in Subsection (a) of this
 section, including:
 (A)  lifetime appointment;
 (B)  appointment for a term;
 (C)  appointment for a term, followed by a
 partisan election;
 (D)  appointment for a term, followed by a
 nonpartisan election;
 (E)  appointment for a term, followed by a
 nonpartisan retention election;
 (F)  partisan election for an open seat, followed
 by a nonpartisan retention election for incumbents; and
 (G)  any other method or combination of methods
 for selecting a judicial officer described by Subsection (a) of
 this section.
 (c)  The joint interim committee shall be composed of six
 senators and six members of the house of representatives as
 follows:
 (1)  the chair of the senate jurisprudence committee,
 the chair of the senate criminal justice committee, and four
 senators appointed by the lieutenant governor; and
 (2)  the chair of the judiciary and civil jurisprudence
 committee of the house of representatives, the chair of the
 criminal jurisprudence committee of the house of representatives,
 and four members of the house of representatives appointed by the
 speaker of the house of representatives.
 (d)  When making appointments under Subsection (c) of this
 section, the lieutenant governor shall ensure that three senators
 from the majority party of the senate are appointed to the committee
 and three senators from the minority party of the senate are
 appointed to the committee. When making appointments under
 Subsection (c) of this section, the speaker of the house of
 representatives shall ensure that three members from the majority
 party of the house of representatives are appointed to the
 committee and three members from the minority party of the house of
 representatives are appointed to the committee.
 (e)  The lieutenant governor and speaker of the house of
 representatives shall each designate a co-chair from among the
 committee members.
 (f)  The joint interim committee shall convene at the joint
 call of the co-chairs.
 (g)  The joint interim committee has all other powers and
 duties provided to a special or select committee by the rules of the
 senate and house of representatives, by Subchapter B, Chapter 301,
 Government Code, and by policies of the senate and house committees
 on administration.
 (h)  Not later than January 6, 2015, the joint interim
 committee shall report the committee's findings and
 recommendations to the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the
 house of representatives, and the governor. The committee shall
 include in its recommendations specific constitutional and
 statutory changes that appear necessary from the results of the
 committee's study.
 (i)  From the contingent expense fund of the senate and the
 contingent expense fund of the house of representatives equally,
 the members of the joint interim committee shall be reimbursed for
 expenses incurred in carrying out the provisions of this Act in
 accordance with the senate and house of representatives rules of
 procedure and the policies of the committees on administration.
 Other necessary expenses of operation shall be paid from the
 contingent expense fund of the senate and the contingent expense
 fund of the house of representatives equally.
 (j)  The Texas Legislative Council shall provide legal and
 policy research, bill drafting, and statistical analysis services
 to the committee created under this section.
 SECTION 2.  ABOLITION OF COMMITTEE. The committee is
 abolished and this Act expires January 12, 2015.
 SECTION 3.  EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect
 immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members
 elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas
 Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for
 immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2772 was passed by the House on May 2,
 2013, by the following vote:  Yeas 134, Nays 13, 2 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 2772 on May 20, 2013, by the following vote:  Yeas 128, Nays 16,
 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2772 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 17, 2013, by the following vote:  Yeas 23, Nays
 7.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor