Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2806 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Geren (Senate Sponsor - Van de Putte) H.B. No. 2806
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2013;
 May 7, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Business
 and Commerce; May 16, 2013, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 16, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to delinquent payment of an alcoholic beverage retailer's
 account for liquor.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 102.32(c), Alcoholic Beverage Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (c)  On purchases made from the 1st through 15th day of a
 month, payment must be made on or before the 25th day of that month.
 On purchases made on the 16th through the last day of a month,
 payment must be made on or before the 10th day of the following
 month. An account is not delinquent if payment is received by the
 wholesale dealer not later than the fourth business day after the
 date payment is due under this subsection.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *