Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2836 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Ratliff, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Patrick) H.B. No. 2836
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 1, 2013;
 May 9, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 20, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0;
 May 20, 2013, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2836 By:  Patrick


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the administration of certain state assessment
 instruments to public school students and to a study of the
 essential knowledge and skills of the required public school
 curriculum and of certain state assessment instruments.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 39.023, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (a-3), (a-4), and (a-5) to read as follows:
 (a-3)  Before an assessment instrument adopted or developed
 under Subsection (a) may be administered under that subsection, the
 assessment instrument must, on the basis of empirical evidence, be
 determined to be valid and reliable by an entity that is independent
 of the agency and of any other entity that developed the assessment
 instrument.
 (a-4)  An assessment instrument adopted or developed under
 Subsection (a) must be designed so that a majority of students will
 be able to complete the assessment instrument within 180 minutes.
 (a-5)  The amount of time allowed for administration of an
 assessment instrument adopted or developed under Subsection (a) may
 not exceed eight hours, and the administration may occur on only one
 day.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter B, Chapter 39, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 39.0236 to read as follows:
 Sec. 39.0236.  STUDY OF ESSENTIAL KNOWLEDGE AND SKILLS AND
 ASSESSMENT INSTRUMENTS. (a) An advisory committee shall be
 established to conduct a study regarding the essential knowledge
 and skills of the required curriculum and assessment instruments
 administered under Section 39.023 to students in grades three
 through eight. The committee must be composed of:
 (1)  four members of the senate education committee
 appointed by the lieutenant governor and four members of the house
 public education committee appointed by the speaker of the house of
 representatives;
 (2)  two members of the public appointed by the
 lieutenant governor;
 (3)  two members of the public appointed by the speaker
 of the house of representatives; and
 (4)  two members of the State Board of Education
 appointed by the chair of the board.
 (b)  The study must evaluate:
 (1)  the number and scope of the essential knowledge
 and skills of each subject area of the required curriculum under
 Section 28.002 and whether the number or scope should be limited;
 (2)  the number and subjects of assessment instruments
 under Section 39.023 that should be administered to students in
 grades three through eight; and
 (3)  whether assessment instruments described by
 Subdivision (2) should assess only essential knowledge and skills
 or should also assess supporting standards.
 (c)  Not later than October 1, 2014, the committee shall
 prepare and submit to the governor, each member of the legislature,
 the commissioner, and the State Board of Education a report that
 includes the results of the study and recommendations regarding
 each issue evaluated under Subsection (b).
 (d)  This section expires June 1, 2015.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter B, Chapter 39, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 39.0263 to read as follows:
 Sec. 39.0263.  ADMINISTRATION OF DISTRICT-REQUIRED
 BENCHMARK ASSESSMENT INSTRUMENTS TO PREPARE STUDENTS FOR
 STATE-ADMINISTERED ASSESSMENT INSTRUMENTS. (a) In this section,
 "benchmark assessment instrument" means a district-required
 assessment instrument designed to prepare students for a
 corresponding state-administered assessment instrument.
 (b)  Except as provided by Subsection (c), a school district
 may not administer to any student more than two benchmark
 assessment instruments to prepare the student for a corresponding
 state-administered assessment instrument.
 (c)  The prohibition prescribed by this section does not
 apply to the administration of a college preparation assessment
 instrument, including the PSAT, the ACT-Plan, the SAT, or the ACT,
 an advanced placement test, an international baccalaureate
 examination, a formative assessment used by a teacher to adjust
 ongoing teaching and learning, or an independent classroom
 examination designed or adopted and administered by a classroom
 teacher.
 (d)  A parent of or person standing in parental relation to a
 student who has special needs, as determined in accordance with
 commissioner rule, may request administration to the student of
 additional benchmark assessment instruments.
 SECTION 4.  Section 39.0301, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (a-1) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  In establishing procedures for the administration of
 assessment instruments under Subsection (a)(1), the commissioner
 shall ensure that the procedures are designed to minimize
 disruptions to school operations and the classroom environment. In
 implementing the procedures established for the administration of
 assessment instruments under Subsection (a)(1), a school district
 shall minimize disruptions to school operations and the classroom
 environment.
 SECTION 5.  This Act applies beginning with the 2013-2014
 school year.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *