Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2982 Comm Sub / Bill

                    By: Keffer (Senate Sponsor - Duncan) H.B. No. 2982
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 9, 2013;
 May 10, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources; May 17, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 11, Nays 0;
 May 17, 2013, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2982 By:  Duncan


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the power of the Railroad Commission of Texas to adopt
 and enforce safety standards applicable to the transportation by
 pipeline of hazardous liquids, carbon dioxide, and natural gas in
 rural locations.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Section 117.011, Natural
 Resources Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 117.011.  JURISDICTION UNDER DELEGATED FEDERAL
 AUTHORITY.
 SECTION 2.  Sections 117.012(a), (b), and (h), Natural
 Resources Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The commission shall adopt rules that include safety
 standards [for and practices] applicable to the intrastate
 transportation of hazardous liquids or carbon dioxide by pipeline
 and intrastate hazardous liquid or carbon dioxide pipeline
 facilities, including safety standards related to the prevention of
 damage to such a facility resulting from the movement of earth by a
 person in the vicinity of the facility, other than movement by
 tillage that does not exceed a depth of 16 inches.  Rules adopted
 under this subsection that apply to the intrastate transportation
 of hazardous liquids and carbon dioxide by gathering pipelines in
 rural locations and intrastate hazardous liquid and carbon dioxide
 gathering pipeline facilities in rural locations must be based only
 on the risks the transportation and the facilities present to the
 public safety, except that the commission shall revise the rules as
 necessary to comply with Subsection (c) and to maintain the maximum
 degree of federal delegation permissible under 49 U.S.C. Section
 60101 et seq., or a succeeding law, if the federal government adopts
 rules that include safety standards applicable to the
 transportation and facilities.
 (b)  Rules that adopt safety standards do not apply to
 [movement of hazardous liquids or carbon dioxide through gathering
 lines in rural locations or] production, refining, or manufacturing
 facilities or storage or in-plant piping systems associated with
 any of those facilities.
 (h)  The commission shall require operators of hazardous
 liquid and carbon dioxide pipeline facilities or the [their]
 designated representatives of such operators to communicate and
 conduct liaison activities with fire, police, and other appropriate
 public emergency response officials. The liaison activities must
 be conducted by meetings in person except as provided by this
 section. An operator or the operator's representative may conduct
 required community liaison activities as provided by Subsection (i)
 only if the operator or the operator's representative has made an
 effort, by one of the following methods, to conduct a community
 liaison meeting in person with the officials:
 (1)  mailing a written request for a meeting in person
 to the appropriate officials by certified mail, return receipt
 requested;
 (2)  sending a request for a meeting in person to the
 appropriate officials by facsimile transmission; or
 (3)  making one or more telephone calls or e-mail
 message transmissions to the appropriate officials to request a
 meeting in person.
 SECTION 3.  The heading to Section 121.201, Utilities Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 121.201.  SAFETY RULES;[:] RAILROAD COMMISSION POWER
 UNDER DELEGATED FEDERAL AUTHORITY.
 SECTION 4.  Section 121.201(a), Utilities Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  The railroad commission may:
 (1)  by rule prescribe or adopt safety standards for
 the transportation of gas and for gas pipeline facilities,
 including safety standards related to the prevention of damage to
 such a facility resulting from the movement of earth by a person in
 the vicinity of the facility, other than movement by tillage that
 does not exceed a depth of 16 inches;
 (2)  by rule require an operator that does not file
 operator organization information under Section 91.142, Natural
 Resources Code, to provide the information to the commission in the
 form of an application;
 (3)  by rule require record maintenance and reports;
 (4)  inspect records and facilities to determine
 compliance with safety standards prescribed or adopted under
 Subdivision (1);
 (5)  make certifications and reports from time to time;
 (6)  seek designation by the United States secretary of
 transportation as an agent to conduct safety inspections of
 interstate gas pipeline facilities located in this state; [and]
 (7)  by rule take any other requisite action in
 accordance with  49 U.S.C. Section 60101 et seq., or a succeeding
 law; and
 (8)  by rule establish safety standards and practices
 for gathering facilities and transportation activities in Class 1
 locations, as defined by 49 C.F.R. Section 192.5:
 (A)  based only on the risks the facilities and
 activities present to the public safety, to the extent consistent
 with federal law; or
 (B)  as necessary to maintain the maximum degree
 of federal delegation permissible under 49 U.S.C. Section 60101 et
 seq., or a succeeding law, if the federal government adopts safety
 standards and practices for gathering facilities and
 transportation activities in Class 1 locations, as defined by 49
 C.F.R. Section 192.5.
 SECTION 5.  Before September 1, 2015, the Railroad
 Commission of Texas may implement the changes in law made by this
 Act to Chapter 117, Natural Resources Code, or Chapter 121,
 Utilities Code, or rules adopted under those chapters, as amended
 by this Act, only:
 (1)  to provide a process for the commission to
 investigate an accident, incident, complaint, or threat to public
 safety related to operational safety and to require an operator to
 submit a plan to remediate an accident, incident, complaint, or
 threat;
 (2)  to require reports necessary to allow the
 commission to investigate an accident, incident, complaint, or
 threat to public safety related to operational safety; or
 (3)  to require operators to provide information to the
 commission that the commission determines is necessary to determine
 the risks presented to the public safety by:
 (A)  the intrastate transportation of hazardous
 liquids and carbon dioxide by gathering pipeline facilities in
 rural locations and intrastate hazardous liquid and carbon dioxide
 gathering pipeline facilities in rural locations; and
 (B)  gas gathering facilities and transportation
 activities in Class 1 locations, as defined by 49 C.F.R. Section
 192.5.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *