Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3093 Enrolled / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.B. No. 3093


 AN ACT
 relating to the powers and duties of the Department of Information
 Resources and the Legislative Budget Board regarding information
 resources technologies of state agencies.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2054.051, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (h) to read as follows:
 (h)  The department shall:
 (1)  coordinate with the quality assurance team to
 develop contracting standards for information resources
 technologies acquisition and purchased services; and
 (2)  work with state agencies to ensure deployment of
 standardized contracts.
 SECTION 2.  Section 2054.055, Government Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (b-2) to read as
 follows:
 (b)  The report must:
 (1)  assess the progress made toward meeting the goals
 and objectives of the state strategic plan for information
 resources management;
 (2)  describe major accomplishments of the state or a
 specific state agency in information resources management;
 (3)  describe major problems in information resources
 management confronting the state or a specific state agency;
 (4)  provide a summary of the total expenditures for
 information resources and information resources technologies by
 the state;
 (5)  make recommendations for improving the
 effectiveness and cost-efficiency of the state's use of information
 resources;
 (6)  describe the status, progress, benefits, and
 efficiency gains of the state electronic Internet portal project,
 including any significant issues regarding contract performance;
 (7)  provide a financial summary of the state
 electronic Internet portal project, including project costs and
 revenues;
 (8)  provide a summary of the amount and use of
 Internet-based training conducted by each state agency and
 institution of higher education;
 (9)  provide a summary of agency and statewide results
 in providing access to electronic and information resources to
 individuals with disabilities as required by Subchapter M; [and]
 (10)  assess the progress made toward accomplishing the
 goals of the plan for a state telecommunications network and
 developing a system of telecommunications services as provided by
 Subchapter H;
 (11)  identify proposed major information resources
 projects for the next state fiscal biennium, including project
 costs through stages of the project and across state fiscal years
 from project initiation to implementation;
 (12)  examine major information resources projects
 completed in the previous state fiscal biennium to determine the
 performance of the implementing state agency, cost and value
 effectiveness, timeliness, and other performance criteria
 necessary to assess the quality and value of the investment; and
 (13)  examine major information resources projects
 after the second anniversary of the project's completion to
 determine progress toward meeting performance goals and operating
 budget savings.
 (b-2)  The information required under Subsection (b)(11)
 must include:
 (1)  final total cost of ownership budget data for the
 entire life cycle of the major information resources project,
 including capital and operational costs that itemize staffing
 costs, contracted services, hardware purchased or leased, software
 purchased or leased, travel, and training;
 (2)  the original project schedule and the final actual
 project schedule;
 (3)  data on the progress toward meeting the original
 goals and performance measures of the project, specifically those
 related to operating budget savings;
 (4)  lessons learned on the project, performance
 evaluations of any vendors used in the project, and reasons for
 project delays or cost increases; and
 (5)  the benefits, cost avoidance, and cost savings
 generated by major technology resources projects.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter C, Chapter 2054, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 2054.066 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2054.066.  DEPARTMENT REVIEW. (a)  The department, in
 consultation with the quality assurance team, the Information
 Technology Council for Higher Education, and the Legislative Budget
 Board, shall review existing statutes, procedures, data, and
 organizational structures to identify opportunities to increase
 efficiency, customer service, and transparency in information
 resources technologies. The department must:
 (1)  identify and address financial data needed to
 comprehensively evaluate information resources technologies
 spending from an enterprise perspective;
 (2)  review best practices in information resources
 technologies governance, including private sector practices and
 lessons learned from other states; and
 (3)  review existing statutes regarding information
 resources technologies governance, standards, and financing to
 identify inconsistencies between current law and best practices.
 (b)  The department shall report its findings and
 recommendations to the governor, lieutenant governor, speaker of
 the house of representatives, Senate Committee on Government
 Organization, and House Technology Committee not later than
 December 1, 2014.
 SECTION 4.  Section 2054.102, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (b-1) to read as follows:
 (b-1)  The Legislative Budget Board, in consultation with
 the department and the Information Technology Council for Higher
 Education, shall establish criteria to evaluate state agency
 biennial operating plans. In developing the criteria, the board
 shall include criteria on:
 (1)  the feasibility of proposed information resources
 projects for the biennium;
 (2)  the consistency of the plan with the state
 strategic plan;
 (3)  the appropriate provision of public electronic
 access to information;
 (4)  evidence of business process streamlining and
 gathering of business and technical requirements; and
 (5)  services, costs, and benefits.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3093 was passed by the House on May 4,
 2013, by the following vote:  Yeas 138, Nays 0, 2 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 3093 on May 23, 2013, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 3093 on May 26, 2013, by the following vote:  Yeas 140,
 Nays 0, 3 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3093 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 20, 2013, by the following vote:  Yeas 27, Nays
 4; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 3093 on May 26, 2013, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor