Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB31 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Branch, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 31
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2013;
 May 7, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher
 Education; May 17, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0;
 May 17, 2013, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 31 By:  Zaffirini


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain requirements applicable to meetings of the
 governing board of a general academic teaching institution or a
 state university system.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter F, Chapter 551, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 551.1281 to read as follows:
 Sec. 551.1281.  GOVERNING BOARD OF GENERAL ACADEMIC TEACHING
 INSTITUTION OR UNIVERSITY SYSTEM: INTERNET POSTING OF MEETING
 MATERIALS AND BROADCAST OF OPEN MEETING. (a) In this section,
 "general academic teaching institution" and "university system"
 have the meanings assigned by Section 61.003, Education Code.
 (b)  The governing board of a general academic teaching
 institution or of a university system that includes one or more
 component general academic teaching institutions, for any
 regularly scheduled meeting of the governing board for which notice
 is required under this chapter, shall:
 (1)  post as early as practicable in advance of the
 meeting on the Internet website of the institution or university
 system, as applicable, any written agenda and related supplemental
 written materials provided to the governing board members in
 advance of the meeting by the institution or system for the members'
 use during the meeting;
 (2)  broadcast the meeting, other than any portions of
 the meeting closed to the public as authorized by law, over the
 Internet in the manner prescribed by Section 551.128; and
 (3)  record the broadcast and make that recording
 publicly available in an online archive located on the
 institution's or university system's Internet website.
 (c)  Subsection (b)(1) does not apply to written materials
 that the general counsel or other appropriate attorney for the
 institution or university system certifies are confidential or may
 be withheld from public disclosure under Chapter 552.
 (d)  The governing board of a general academic teaching
 institution or of a university system is not required to comply with
 the requirements of this section if that compliance is not possible
 because of an act of God, force majeure, or a similar cause not
 reasonably within the governing board's control.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a meeting of the governing board of a general academic teaching
 institution or of a state university system for which notice is
 given under Chapter 551, Government Code, on or after January 1,
 2014.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *