H.B. No. 31 AN ACT relating to certain requirements applicable to meetings of the governing board of a general academic teaching institution or a state university system. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter F, Chapter 551, Government Code, is amended by adding Section 551.1281 to read as follows: Sec. 551.1281. GOVERNING BOARD OF GENERAL ACADEMIC TEACHING INSTITUTION OR UNIVERSITY SYSTEM: INTERNET POSTING OF MEETING MATERIALS AND BROADCAST OF OPEN MEETING. (a) In this section, "general academic teaching institution" and "university system" have the meanings assigned by Section 61.003, Education Code. (b) The governing board of a general academic teaching institution or of a university system that includes one or more component general academic teaching institutions, for any regularly scheduled meeting of the governing board for which notice is required under this chapter, shall: (1) post as early as practicable in advance of the meeting on the Internet website of the institution or university system, as applicable, any written agenda and related supplemental written materials provided to the governing board members in advance of the meeting by the institution or system for the members' use during the meeting; (2) broadcast the meeting, other than any portions of the meeting closed to the public as authorized by law, over the Internet in the manner prescribed by Section 551.128; and (3) record the broadcast and make that recording publicly available in an online archive located on the institution's or university system's Internet website. (c) Subsection (b)(1) does not apply to written materials that the general counsel or other appropriate attorney for the institution or university system certifies are confidential or may be withheld from public disclosure under Chapter 552. (d) The governing board of a general academic teaching institution or of a university system is not required to comply with the requirements of this section if that compliance is not possible because of an act of God, force majeure, or a similar cause not reasonably within the governing board's control. SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies only to a meeting of the governing board of a general academic teaching institution or of a state university system for which notice is given under Chapter 551, Government Code, on or after January 1, 2014. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2013. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 31 was passed by the House on May 4, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 135, Nays 0, 2 present, not voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. No. 31 on May 24, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 146, Nays 0, 2 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 31 was passed by the Senate, with amendments, on May 22, 2013, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: __________________ Date __________________ Governor