Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3209 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Alonzo, Menendez (Senate Sponsor - Uresti) H.B. No. 3209
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2013;
 May 6, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Administration; May 16, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0;
 May 16, 2013, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3209 By:  Eltife


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to creating a recognition day in honor of Willie
 Velasquez.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 662, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 662.060 to read as follows:
 Sec. 662.060.  WILLIE VELASQUEZ DAY.  (a)  May 9 is Willie
 Velasquez Day in observance of the birthday of William "Willie"
 Cardenas Velasquez.
 (b)  Willie Velasquez Day shall be regularly observed by
 appropriate ceremonies and activities.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *