Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3256 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Kacal, Cook (Senate Sponsor - Uresti) H.B. No. 3256
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2013;
 May 7, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 15, 2013, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 15, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the eligibility of certain vehicles to be operated as
 farm vehicles on a road or highway in this state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 502.146, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (h) to read as follows:
 (h)  A specialty license plate may not be issued under
 Subsection (a) to an owner of a vehicle described by Subsection
 (b)(1) unless the vehicle's owner provides a registration number
 issued by the comptroller under Section 151.1551, Tax Code. The
 comptroller shall allow access to the online system established
 under Section 151.1551(l), Tax Code, to verify a registration
 number provided under this subsection.
 SECTION 2.  Section 502.433, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (a-1) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  A commercial motor vehicle may not be registered under
 this section unless the vehicle's owner provides a registration
 number issued by the comptroller under Section 151.1551, Tax Code.
 The comptroller shall allow access to the online system established
 under Section 151.1551(l), Tax Code, to verify a registration
 number provided under this subsection.
 SECTION 3.  Section 502.434, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (a-1) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  A permit may not be issued under this section unless
 the vehicle's owner provides a registration number issued by the
 comptroller under Section 151.1551, Tax Code. The comptroller shall
 allow access to the online system established under Section
 151.1551(l), Tax Code, to verify a registration number provided
 under this subsection.
 SECTION 4.  The changes in law made by this Act to Sections
 502.146, 502.433, and 502.434, Transportation Code, apply only to
 an application submitted for approval on or after the effective
 date of this Act.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *