Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3259 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Wu (Senate Sponsor - Huffman) H.B. No. 3259
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 22, 2013;
 April 24, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Jurisprudence; May 20, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0;
 May 20, 2013, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3259 By:  Campbell


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the ownership of and access to certain investigation
 records in child abuse and neglect cases.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 264.0145(a), Family Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  In this section, "case record" means those files,
 reports, records, communications, audio recordings, video
 recordings [audiotapes, videotapes], or working papers under the
 custody and control of the department that are collected,
 developed, or used:
 (1)  in a child abuse or neglect investigation; or
 (2)  in providing services as a result of an
 investigation, including substitute care services for a child.
 SECTION 2.  Sections 264.408(d), (d-1), and (e), Family
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (d)  A video recording of an [videotaped] interview of a
 child that is made at a center is the property of the prosecuting
 attorney involved in the criminal prosecution of the case involving
 the child. If no criminal prosecution occurs, the video recording
 [videotaped interview] is the property of the attorney involved in
 representing the department in a civil action alleging child abuse
 or neglect. If the matter involving the child is not prosecuted,
 the video recording [videotape] is the property of the department
 if the matter is an investigation by the department of abuse or
 neglect. If the department is not investigating or has not
 investigated the matter, the video recording [videotape] is the
 property of the agency that referred the matter to the center. If
 the center employs a custodian of records for video recordings of
 [videotaped] interviews of children, the center is responsible for
 the custody of the video recording [videotape]. A video recording
 of an [videotaped] interview may be shared with other agencies
 under a written agreement.
 (d-1)  A video recording of an [videotaped] interview
 described by Subsection (d) is subject to production under Article
 39.14, Code of Criminal Procedure, and Rule 615, Texas Rules of
 Evidence.  A court shall deny any request by a defendant to copy,
 photograph, duplicate, or otherwise reproduce a video recording
 [videotape] of an interview described by Subsection (d), provided
 that the prosecuting attorney makes the video recording [videotape]
 reasonably available to the defendant in the same manner as
 property or material may be made available to defendants,
 attorneys, and expert witnesses under Article 39.15(d), Code of
 Criminal Procedure.
 (e)  The department shall be allowed access to a center's
 video recordings of [videotaped] interviews of children.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *