Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3436 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 83RD LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            April 7, 2013      TO: Honorable Linda Harper-Brown, Chair, House Committee on Government Efficiency & Reform      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB3436 by Cook (Relating to formal action of responsible governmental entities on certain proposals or bids for certain projects.), As Introduced    No fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.  The bill would amend the Government Code, Chapter 2267 to delay a formal action on public-private partnership proposals or bids until September 1, 2013. The section would expire September 2, 2013.  The bill takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If the bill does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, it takes effect August 26, 2013. Local Government Impact School districts and other local governments considering a formal action on a proposal or bid for certain public-private partnership construction projects would have to delay action until September 1, 2013. Based on the analysis of the Texas Education Agency, if the provisions of the bill took effect on August 26, 2013, those provisions would only apply for six calendar days, and resulting fiscal impacts to local governments would be minimal. The bill would not affect projects already in progress. If the provisions of the bill took effect earlier due to the bill being approved with the necessary voting margins, construction delays could result in significant costs to school districts and other local governments.     Source Agencies:303 Facilities Commission, 405 Department of Public Safety, 696 Department of Criminal Justice, 701 Central Education Agency   LBB Staff:  UP, KJo, JI, JJO, JBi, KKR    

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 83RD LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
April 7, 2013





  TO: Honorable Linda Harper-Brown, Chair, House Committee on Government Efficiency & Reform      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB3436 by Cook (Relating to formal action of responsible governmental entities on certain proposals or bids for certain projects.), As Introduced  

TO: Honorable Linda Harper-Brown, Chair, House Committee on Government Efficiency & Reform
FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB3436 by Cook (Relating to formal action of responsible governmental entities on certain proposals or bids for certain projects.), As Introduced

 Honorable Linda Harper-Brown, Chair, House Committee on Government Efficiency & Reform 

 Honorable Linda Harper-Brown, Chair, House Committee on Government Efficiency & Reform 

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB3436 by Cook (Relating to formal action of responsible governmental entities on certain proposals or bids for certain projects.), As Introduced

HB3436 by Cook (Relating to formal action of responsible governmental entities on certain proposals or bids for certain projects.), As Introduced



No fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

No fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.



The bill would amend the Government Code, Chapter 2267 to delay a formal action on public-private partnership proposals or bids until September 1, 2013. The section would expire September 2, 2013.  The bill takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If the bill does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, it takes effect August 26, 2013.

The bill would amend the Government Code, Chapter 2267 to delay a formal action on public-private partnership proposals or bids until September 1, 2013. The section would expire September 2, 2013. 

The bill takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If the bill does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, it takes effect August 26, 2013.

Local Government Impact

School districts and other local governments considering a formal action on a proposal or bid for certain public-private partnership construction projects would have to delay action until September 1, 2013. Based on the analysis of the Texas Education Agency, if the provisions of the bill took effect on August 26, 2013, those provisions would only apply for six calendar days, and resulting fiscal impacts to local governments would be minimal. The bill would not affect projects already in progress. If the provisions of the bill took effect earlier due to the bill being approved with the necessary voting margins, construction delays could result in significant costs to school districts and other local governments. 

School districts and other local governments considering a formal action on a proposal or bid for certain public-private partnership construction projects would have to delay action until September 1, 2013. Based on the analysis of the Texas Education Agency, if the provisions of the bill took effect on August 26, 2013, those provisions would only apply for six calendar days, and resulting fiscal impacts to local governments would be minimal. The bill would not affect projects already in progress. If the provisions of the bill took effect earlier due to the bill being approved with the necessary voting margins, construction delays could result in significant costs to school districts and other local governments. 

Source Agencies: 303 Facilities Commission, 405 Department of Public Safety, 696 Department of Criminal Justice, 701 Central Education Agency

303 Facilities Commission, 405 Department of Public Safety, 696 Department of Criminal Justice, 701 Central Education Agency

LBB Staff: UP, KJo, JI, JJO, JBi, KKR

 UP, KJo, JI, JJO, JBi, KKR