By: Cook (Senate Sponsor - Whitmire) H.B. No. 3436 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2013; May 8, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development; May 20, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 20, 2013, sent to printer.) COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3436 By: Deuell A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the use and development of state property, including real property within the Capitol complex. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter F, Chapter 2165, Government Code, is amended by adding Section 2165.259 to read as follows: Sec. 2165.259. CAPITOL COMPLEX. (a) In this section, "Capitol complex" has the meaning assigned by Section 443.0071. (b) Notwithstanding Subchapter D, the commission may not lease, sell, or otherwise dispose of real property or an interest in real property located in the Capitol complex. (c) This section does not affect the commission's authority under Subchapter E to lease space in state office buildings and parking garages. SECTION 2. Subchapter A, Chapter 2267, Government Code, as added by Chapter 1334 (S.B. 1048), Acts of the 82nd Legislature, Regular Session, 2011, is amended by adding Section 2267.005 to read as follows: Sec. 2267.005. QUALIFYING PROJECTS IN CAPITOL COMPLEX. The Texas Facilities Commission may develop or operate a qualifying project located in the Capitol complex, as defined by Section 443.0071, as provided by this chapter only if specifically granted the authority by the legislature. SECTION 3. Subchapter B, Chapter 2267, Government Code, as added by Chapter 1334 (S.B. 1048), Acts of the 82nd Legislature, Regular Session, 2011, is amended by adding Section 2267.0531 to read as follows: Sec. 2267.0531. COMPREHENSIVE AGREEMENT DELAYED. (a) The responsible governmental entity, as defined by Government Code Chapter 2267.001(5)(A) excluding institutions of higher education, may not enter into a comprehensive agreement under this chapter before September 1, 2014. (b) This section expires September 2, 2014. SECTION 4. Section 31.155(d), Natural Resources Code, is amended to read as follows: (d) The duty under this subchapter of the division to review and verify real property records and to make recommendations regarding real property and of the commissioner to prepare a report involving real property does not apply to: (1) the real property of an institution of higher education; (2) the real property that is part of a fund created or specifically authorized by the constitution of this state and that is administered by or with the assistance of the land office; (3) the real property of the Employees Retirement System of Texas; [and] (4) the real property of the Teacher Retirement System of Texas; and (5) the real property located in the Capitol complex, as defined by Section 443.0071, Government Code. SECTION 5. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2013. * * * * *