Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3436 Enrolled / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.B. No. 3436


 AN ACT
 relating to the use and development of state property, including
 real property within the Capitol complex.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter F, Chapter 2165, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 2165.259 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2165.259.  CAPITOL COMPLEX.  (a)  In this section,
 "Capitol complex" has the meaning assigned by Section 443.0071.
 (b)  Notwithstanding Subchapter D, the commission may not
 lease, sell, or otherwise dispose of real property or an interest in
 real property located in the Capitol complex.
 (c)  This section does not affect the commission's authority
 under Subchapter E to lease space in state office buildings and
 parking garages.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter A, Chapter 2267, Government Code, as
 added by Chapter 1334 (S.B. 1048), Acts of the 82nd Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2011, is amended by adding Section 2267.005 to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 2267.005.  QUALIFYING PROJECTS IN CAPITOL COMPLEX.  The
 Texas Facilities Commission may develop or operate a qualifying
 project located in the Capitol complex, as defined by Section
 443.0071, as provided by this chapter only if specifically granted
 the authority by the legislature.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter B, Chapter 2267, Government Code, as
 added by Chapter 1334 (S.B. 1048), Acts of the 82nd Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2011, is amended by adding Section 2267.0531 to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 2267.0531.  COMPREHENSIVE AGREEMENT DELAYED.  (a)  The
 responsible governmental entity, as defined by Section
 2267.001(5)(A), Government Code, excluding institutions of higher
 education, may not enter into a comprehensive agreement under this
 chapter before September 1, 2014.
 (b)  This section expires September 2, 2014.
 SECTION 4.  Section 31.155(d), Natural Resources Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (d)  The duty under this subchapter of the division to review
 and verify real property records and to make recommendations
 regarding real property and of the commissioner to prepare a report
 involving real property does not apply to:
 (1)  the real property of an institution of higher
 education;
 (2)  the real property that is part of a fund created or
 specifically authorized by the constitution of this state and that
 is administered by or with the assistance of the land office;
 (3)  the real property of the Employees Retirement
 System of Texas; [and]
 (4)  the real property of the Teacher Retirement System
 of Texas; and
 (5)  the real property located in the Capitol complex,
 as defined by Section 443.0071, Government Code.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3436 was passed by the House on May 3,
 2013, by the following vote:  Yeas 141, Nays 1, 1 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 3436 on May 23, 2013, by the following vote:  Yeas 142, Nays 0,
 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3436 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 21, 2013, by the following vote:  Yeas 30, Nays
 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor