Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3438 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Otto, Button (Senate Sponsor - Lucio) H.B. No. 3438
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 9, 2013;
 May 10, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 May 20, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 14, Nays 0; May 20, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the eligibility of a person to serve on the appraisal
 review board of an appraisal district.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 6.412(d), Tax Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 (d)  A person is ineligible to serve on the appraisal review
 board of an appraisal district established for a county having a
 population of more than 100,000:
 (1)  if the person:
 (A)  has served for all or part of three previous
 terms as a board member or auxiliary board member on the appraisal
 review board; or
 (B)  is a former member of the board of directors,
 officer, or employee of the appraisal district; [or]
 (2)  if the person served as a member of the governing
 body or officer of a taxing unit for which the appraisal district
 appraises property, until the fourth anniversary of the date the
 person ceased to be a member or officer; or
 (3)  if the person [has ever] appeared before the
 appraisal review board for compensation during the two-year period
 preceding the date the person is appointed.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *